Adair et al v. Hodge et al
Plaintiff: Randal Ryan, Alan Bardgett, Rachel Bardgett, Jeff Adair, Lori Adair, Serena Ryan, Destiny Sanchez and Francisco Sanchez
Defendant: Independent School District No. 3 County, Edward Lee Hodge, Broken Arrow Public Schools and Independent School District No. 3 of Tulsa County
Case Number: 4:2019cv00583
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Edward Lee Hodge (Walta, Phyllis)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 6/19/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 7/6/2020, Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/28/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Jury Trial set for 10/19/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 Agreed JOINT STATUS REPORT by Jeff Adair, Lori Adair, Alan Bardgett, Rachel Bardgett, Randal Ryan, Serena Ryan, Destiny Sanchez, Francisco Sanchez (Allen, Hilary)
December 4, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Edward Lee Hodge (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Lori Adair, Alan Bardgett, Randal Ryan, Destiny Sanchez, Serena Ryan, Jeff Adair, Rachel Bardgett, Francisco Sanchez (Allen, Hilary)
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Edward Lee Hodge (jjs, Dpty Clk)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joshua L. Young on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Young, Joshua)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Hilary Sullivan Allen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Allen, Hilary)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kent Bolling Rainey on behalf of Independent School District No. 3 of Tulsa County [Note: Attorney Kent Bolling Rainey added to party Independent School District No. 3 of Tulsa County(pty:dft).] (Rainey, Kent)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Phyllis L Walta on behalf of Edward Lee Hodge (Walta, Phyllis)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Phyllis L Walta on behalf of Edward Lee Hodge (Walta, Phyllis)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 12/9/2019) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Independent School District No. 3 of Tulsa County (Priddy, John)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Independent School District No. 3 of Tulsa County (Priddy, John)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jerry Alan Richardson on behalf of Independent School District No. 3 County (Richardson, Jerry)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Eric Priddy on behalf of Independent School District No. 3 County (Priddy, John)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa, case number CJ-2019-03364 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2129244) by Independent School District No. 3 County (With attachments) (Priddy, John)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Independent School District No. 3 County (Priddy, John)
August 28, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Lori Adair, Alan Bardgett, Randal Ryan, Destiny Sanchez, Serena Ryan, Jeff Adair, Rachel Bardgett, Francisco Sanchez (alg, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adair et al v. Hodge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent School District No. 3 County
Represented By: John Eric Priddy
Represented By: Jerry Alan Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Lee Hodge
Represented By: Phyllis L Walta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broken Arrow Public Schools
Represented By: John Eric Priddy
Represented By: Jerry Alan Richardson
Represented By: Kent Bolling Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent School District No. 3 of Tulsa County
Represented By: John Eric Priddy
Represented By: Jerry Alan Richardson
Represented By: Kent Bolling Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randal Ryan
Represented By: Hilary Sullivan Allen
Represented By: Joshua L. Young
Represented By: Susan Carns Curtiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Bardgett
Represented By: Hilary Sullivan Allen
Represented By: Joshua L. Young
Represented By: Susan Carns Curtiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Bardgett
Represented By: Hilary Sullivan Allen
Represented By: Joshua L. Young
Represented By: Susan Carns Curtiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Adair
Represented By: Hilary Sullivan Allen
Represented By: Joshua L. Young
Represented By: Susan Carns Curtiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Adair
Represented By: Hilary Sullivan Allen
Represented By: Joshua L. Young
Represented By: Susan Carns Curtiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serena Ryan
Represented By: Hilary Sullivan Allen
Represented By: Joshua L. Young
Represented By: Susan Carns Curtiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Destiny Sanchez
Represented By: Hilary Sullivan Allen
Represented By: Joshua L. Young
Represented By: Susan Carns Curtiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Sanchez
Represented By: Hilary Sullivan Allen
Represented By: Joshua L. Young
Represented By: Susan Carns Curtiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?