Smith v. Tahsin Industrial Corp U.S.A. et al
Plaintiff: John R Smith
Defendant: Ameristep Corporation, Primal Vantage Company, Tahsin Industrial Corp U.S.A. and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 4:2019cv00590
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 23 JOINT STATUS REPORT by John R Smith (Hamilton, Laura)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Motions of Defendants for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Milton S. Karfis (Doc. 18), Steven D. Brock (Doc. 19), Ellisse S. Thompson (Doc. 20) and Stephanie M. Anderson (Doc. 21) are granted. Counsel may appear in this matter on behalf of the defendants. ; granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #21 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
November 22, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephanie M. Anderson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2139869) by Ameristep Corporation, Primal Vantage Company, Tahsin Industrial Corp U.S.A., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (With attachments) (Bradley-Waters, Amy)
November 22, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ellisse S. Thompson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2139848) by Ameristep Corporation, Primal Vantage Company, Tahsin Industrial Corp U.S.A., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (With attachments) (Bradley-Waters, Amy)
November 22, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steven D. Brock to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2139838) by Ameristep Corporation, Primal Vantage Company, Tahsin Industrial Corp U.S.A., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (With attachments) (Bradley-Waters, Amy)
November 22, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Milton S. Karfis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2139829) by Ameristep Corporation, Primal Vantage Company, Tahsin Industrial Corp U.S.A., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (With attachments) (Bradley-Waters, Amy)
November 6, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Donald Eugene Smolen, II on behalf of John R Smith (Smolen, Donald)
November 6, 2019 Filing 16 JURY DEMAND by John R Smith (Hamilton, Laura)
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Laura L Hamilton on behalf of John R Smith [Note: Attorney Laura L Hamilton added to party John R Smith(pty:pla).] (Hamilton, Laura)
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John William Warren on behalf of John R Smith [Note: Attorney John William Warren added to party John R Smith(pty:pla).] (Warren, John)
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Ameristep Corporation, Primal Vantage Company, Tahsin Industrial Corp U.S.A., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Bradley-Waters, Amy)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 12/4/2019) (SAS, Chambers)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 JURY DEMAND by Ameristep Corporation, Primal Vantage Company, Tahsin Industrial Corp U.S.A., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Bradley-Waters, Amy)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Bradley-Waters, Amy)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Primal Vantage Company (Bradley-Waters, Amy)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ameristep Corporation (Bradley-Waters, Amy)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tahsin Industrial Corp U.S.A. (Bradley-Waters, Amy)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Tahsin Industrial Corp U.S.A., Ameristep Corporation, Primal Vantage Company, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amy E Bradley-Waters on behalf of Ameristep Corporation, Primal Vantage Company, Tahsin Industrial Corp U.S.A., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Bradley-Waters, Amy)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Ameristep Corporation, Primal Vantage Company, Tahsin Industrial Corp U.S.A., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Bradley-Waters, Amy)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Ottawa County, case number CJ-2019-118 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2130043) by Ameristep Corporation, Primal Vantage Company, Tahsin Industrial Corp U.S.A., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (With attachments) (Bradley-Waters, Amy)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ameristep Corporation, Primal Vantage Company, Tahsin Industrial Corp U.S.A., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Bradley-Waters, Amy)
September 25, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by John R Smith (alg, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Tahsin Industrial Corp U.S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameristep Corporation
Represented By: Amy E Bradley-Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primal Vantage Company
Represented By: Amy E Bradley-Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tahsin Industrial Corp U.S.A.
Represented By: Amy E Bradley-Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Amy E Bradley-Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R Smith
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Laura L Hamilton
Represented By: John William Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?