Oklahoma Turnpike Authority v. 5.19 Acres of Land, Situated in Tulsa County, Oklahoma, More or less et al
Plaintiff: Oklahoma Turnpike Authority
Defendant: Howard G and Willie Faye Childers, Sharon Koetter, Tulsa County Treasurer, Valton J Childers, Mikael Hayes, Jane Doe, Estate of Raymond A Hayes, 5.19 Acres of Land, Situated in Tulsa County, Oklahoma, More or less, Jimmie Koetter, United States Department of Interior, Bureau of Indian Affairs, Charles W Coleman and Marcia L Coleman, Tulsa County Board of Commissioners, Occupants of 3347 S 57th West Ave, Tulsa, Oklahoma, Jimmy Koetter, Howard G Childers and Charles W Coleman
Case Number: 4:2019cv00606
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE SECOND NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 71.1(d) (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Oklahoma Turnpike Authority (With attachments) (Warrick, William)
December 16, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Jimmie Koetter, husband of Sharon Koetter be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #13 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
December 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Oklahoma Turnpike Authority (Warrick, William)
December 12, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Judge Gregory K Frizzell: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 12/12/2019 , striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s) (Re: #4 Notice (Other) ) (Court Reporter: Brian Neil) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF of Publication of Notice to Defendants upon Defendants on 11/30/19 by Oklahoma Turnpike Authority (Warrick, William)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Tulsa County Treasurer (Wilson, Douglas)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Douglas Allen Wilson on behalf of Tulsa County Treasurer [Note: Attorney Douglas Allen Wilson added to party Tulsa County Treasurer(pty:dft).] (Wilson, Douglas)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Tulsa County Board of Commissioners (Wilson, Douglas)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Douglas Allen Wilson on behalf of Tulsa County Board of Commissioners [Note: Attorney Douglas Allen Wilson added to party Tulsa County Board of Commissioners(pty:dft).] (Wilson, Douglas)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service by Oklahoma Turnpike Authority (With attachments) (Warrick, William)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Setting hearing on Plaintiff's request for Court to appoint commissioners on December 12, 2019 at 2:30 p.m., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Hearing set for 12/12/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (Re: #4 Notice (Other) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE To Defendants of Hearing to Appoint Commissioners (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Oklahoma Turnpike Authority (With attachments) (Warrick, William)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William Brant Warrick on behalf of Oklahoma Turnpike Authority (Warrick, William)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2134358) by Oklahoma Turnpike Authority (With attachments) (Warrick, William)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Oklahoma Turnpike Authority (Warrick, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oklahoma Turnpike Authority v. 5.19 Acres of Land, Situated in Tulsa County, Oklahoma, More or less et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard G and Willie Faye Childers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Koetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsa County Treasurer
Represented By: Douglas Allen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valton J Childers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikael Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Raymond A Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5.19 Acres of Land, Situated in Tulsa County, Oklahoma, More or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmie Koetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior, Bureau of Indian Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W Coleman and Marcia L Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsa County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Douglas Allen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occupants of 3347 S 57th West Ave, Tulsa, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Koetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard G Childers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma Turnpike Authority
Represented By: William Brant Warrick
Represented By: Kelly Francis Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?