Williams v. KTAK Corporation
Plaintiff: Ashanti Williams
Defendant: KTAK Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00611
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated (Documents Terminated: #8 MOTION to Dismiss ) (see document number #14 ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
January 8, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by KTAK Corporation (Snapp, Randall)
January 2, 2020 Filing 13 SURREPLY to Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Ashanti Williams ; (jjs, Dpty Clk)
January 2, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against KTAK Corporation (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Ashanti Williams (jjs, Dpty Clk)
December 23, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Brief in Support of Motion); Correction: changed text to reflect correct event (Reply to Response to Motion) (Re: #11 Brief in Support of Motion ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss ) by KTAK Corporation ; (Snapp, Randall) Modified on 12/23/2019 to change text to reflect correct event (sac, Dpty Clk).
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Ashanti Williams ; (jjs, Dpty Clk)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell In light of the filing of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case. A schedule will be entered after the Court's ruling on the dismissal motion. (Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by KTAK Corporation (Snapp, Randall)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by KTAK Corporation (Snapp, Randall)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Deric James McClellan on behalf of KTAK Corporation (McClellan, Deric)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing KTAK Corporation to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Randall James Snapp on behalf of KTAK Corporation (Snapp, Randall)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by KTAK Corporation (Snapp, Randall)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2019-04143 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2135272) by KTAK Corporation (With attachments) (Snapp, Randall)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by KTAK Corporation (Snapp, Randall)
October 22, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against KTAK Corporation by Ashanti Williams (dlg, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. KTAK Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KTAK Corporation
Represented By: Randall James Snapp
Represented By: Deric James McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashanti Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?