Bank of America, N.A. v. Roberts Auto Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Roberts Ford Lincoln, LLC, Santander Bank, N.A., Firstar Bank, N.A., Bamo Land, LLC, Primalend Capital Partners, LP, Level VI Properties, LLC, Arvest Equipment Finance, A division of Arvest Bank, RWR Rentals, LLC, Roberts Auto Center, LLC, Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC and Michael Scott Roberts
Case Number: 4:2019cv00634
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - PrimaLend Capital Partners, LP's Motion to Dismiss by Primalend Capital Partners, LP (Sparks, Jacob)
January 17, 2020 Filing 62 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Bamo Land, LLC, Level VI Properties, LLC, RWR Rentals, LLC, Michael Scott Roberts, Roberts Auto Center, LLC, Roberts Ford Lincoln, LLC (Gaskins, Garry)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell Defendant Firstar Bank, N.A.'s Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadline to Respond to Complaint (Doc. 60) is granted. Firstar's answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint shall be filed on January 31, 2020. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/31/2020); granting #60 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
January 17, 2020 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Firstar Bank, N.A. (Ratcliff, Marcus)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The hearing on the Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Receiver (Doc. 3) is reset for 1/27/2020 at 1:30 p.m., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Chief Judge John E Dowdell) (Re: #3 MOTION for Appointment of Receiver ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lml, Dpty Clk)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Motion hearing set for 1/10/2019 at 3:00 p.m. is hereby stricken. The parties shall confer with the courtroom deputy, Lisa Lyles, regarding a date to reset the hearing., striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lml, Dpty Clk)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell By separate order (Doc. 44), the Court set a hearing pursuant to a separate motion (Doc. 43) by the plaintiff. Doc. 6 is accordingly moot ; finding as moot 6 Motion for Hearing (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (JED1, Chambers)
January 8, 2020 Filing 56 SUPPLEMENT (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Bank of America, N.A. (Sokolosky, Alexander)
January 6, 2020 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion - PrimaLend Capital Partners, LP's Response and Limited Objection to Bank of America, N.A.'s Motion for Appointment of Receiver and for Injunctive Relief in Aid of Receivership (with Corrected Table of Contents) (Re: #3 MOTION for Appointment of Receiver ) by Primalend Capital Partners, LP ; (With attachments) (Sparks, Jacob)
January 6, 2020 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion - PrimaLend Capital Partners, LP's Response and Limited Objection to Bank of America, N.A.'s Motion for Appointment of Receiver and for Injunctive Relief in Aid of Receivership (Re: #3 MOTION for Appointment of Receiver ) by Primalend Capital Partners, LP ; [Note: Attorney Jacob Sparks added to party Primalend Capital Partners, LP(pty:dft).] (With attachments) (Sparks, Jacob)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell Defendant Primalend Capital Partners, LP's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A.'s Complaint (Doc. 51) is granted. Primalend's answer or other responsive pleading shall be filed by January 17, 2020. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/17/2020); granting #51 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
January 3, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE Notice of Hearing (Re: #3 MOTION for Appointment of Receiver ) by Bank of America, N.A. (With attachments) (Sokolosky, Alexander)
January 2, 2020 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Primalend Capital Partners, LP (Powell, Courtney)
January 2, 2020 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent PCAP Holdings LP for Primalend Capital Partners, LP) by Primalend Capital Partners, LP (Powell, Courtney)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jacob Sparks (Doc. 48) is granted. Mr. Sparks may appear in this matter on behalf of PrimaLend Capital Partners, LP. ; granting #48 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
December 30, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jacob W. Sparks to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2155483) by Primalend Capital Partners, LP (With attachments) (Powell, Courtney)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Roberts Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadline to Respond to Complaint (Doc. 39) is granted. Defendants' answer or other responsive pleading shall be filed by January 17, 2020. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/17/2020); granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell Defendant Firstar Bank, N.A.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadline to Respond to Complaint (Doc. 38) is granted. Firstar's answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint shall be filed by January 17, 2020. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/17/2020); granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
December 26, 2019 Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Primalend Capital Partners, LP to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2020 at 03:00 PM before Chief Judge John E Dowdell); granting #43 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s); finding as moot #4 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #3 MOTION for Appointment of Receiver ) (SAS, Chambers)
December 23, 2019 Filing 43 Supplemental MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Hearing and Shorten Time for Response (Re: #4 MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) ) by Bank of America, N.A. (Harmon, Joel)
December 20, 2019 Filing 42 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Courtney Jo Davis Powell on behalf of Primalend Capital Partners, LP [Note: Attorney Courtney Jo Davis Powell added to party Primalend Capital Partners, LP(pty:dft).] (Powell, Courtney)
December 20, 2019 Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Firstar Bank, N.A., Arvest Equipment Finance, A division of Arvest Bank to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
December 19, 2019 Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Firstar Financial Corp for Firstar Bank, N.A.) by Firstar Bank, N.A. (Ratcliff, Marcus)
December 18, 2019 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Bamo Land, LLC, Level VI Properties, LLC, RWR Rentals, LLC, Michael Scott Roberts, Roberts Auto Center, LLC, Roberts Ford Lincoln, LLC (Gaskins, Garry)
December 18, 2019 Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Firstar Bank, N.A. (Ratcliff, Marcus)
December 18, 2019 Filing 37 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Marcus N Ratcliff on behalf of Firstar Bank, N.A. [Note: Attorney Marcus N Ratcliff added to party Firstar Bank, N.A.(pty:dft).] (Ratcliff, Marcus)
December 18, 2019 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arvest Equipment Finance, A division of Arvest Bank (Skeith, Robert)
December 18, 2019 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Arvest Bank Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Arvest Holdings, Inc. for Arvest Equipment Finance, A division of Arvest Bank) by Arvest Equipment Finance, A division of Arvest Bank (Skeith, Robert)
December 18, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Arvest Equipment Finance, A division of Arvest Bank (Skeith, Robert)
December 18, 2019 Filing 33 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert P Skeith on behalf of Arvest Equipment Finance, A division of Arvest Bank [Note: Attorney Robert P Skeith added to party Arvest Equipment Finance, A division of Arvest Bank(pty:dft).] (Skeith, Robert)
December 12, 2019 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Primalend Capital Partners, LP (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Bank of America, N.A. (Edwards, Joe)
December 12, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Santander Bank, N.A. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Bank of America, N.A. (Edwards, Joe)
December 12, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Arvest Equipment Finance, A division of Arvest Bank (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Bank of America, N.A. (Edwards, Joe)
December 12, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Firstar Bank, N.A. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Bank of America, N.A. (Edwards, Joe)
December 12, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Firstar Bank, N.A. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Bank of America, N.A. (Edwards, Joe)
December 12, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Bank of America, N.A. (Edwards, Joe)
December 11, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Michael Scott Roberts (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Bank of America, N.A. (Edwards, Joe)
December 11, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: RWR Rentals, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Bank of America, N.A. (Edwards, Joe)
December 11, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Bamo Land, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Bank of America, N.A. (Edwards, Joe)
December 11, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Level VI Properties, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Bank of America, N.A. (Edwards, Joe)
December 11, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Roberts Ford Lincoln, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Bank of America, N.A. (Edwards, Joe)
December 11, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Roberts Auto Center, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Bank of America, N.A. (Edwards, Joe)
December 11, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Roberts Auto Center, LLC; Roberts Ford Lincoln, LLC; Level VI Properties, LLC; Bamo Land, LLC; and RWR Rentals, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 9, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Support of Motion (Re: #3 MOTION for Appointment of Receiver ) by Bamo Land, LLC, Level VI Properties, LLC, RWR Rentals, LLC, Michael Scott Roberts, Roberts Auto Center, LLC, Roberts Ford Lincoln, LLC ; (Gaskins, Garry)
December 9, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Roberts Ford Lincoln, LLC (Gaskins, Garry)
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Roberts Auto Center, LLC (Gaskins, Garry)
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RWR Rentals, LLC (Gaskins, Garry)
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Level VI Properties, LLC (Gaskins, Garry)
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bamo Land, LLC (Gaskins, Garry)
December 9, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Garry Michael Gaskins, II on behalf of Bamo Land, LLC, Level VI Properties, LLC, RWR Rentals, LLC, Michael Scott Roberts, Roberts Auto Center, LLC, Roberts Ford Lincoln, LLC [Note: Attorney Garry Michael Gaskins, II added to party Bamo Land, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Garry Michael Gaskins, II added to party Level VI Properties, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Garry Michael Gaskins, II added to party RWR Rentals, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Garry Michael Gaskins, II added to party Michael Scott Roberts(pty:dft), Attorney Garry Michael Gaskins, II added to party Roberts Auto Center, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Garry Michael Gaskins, II added to party Roberts Ford Lincoln, LLC(pty:dft).] (Gaskins, Garry)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 Amended CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company for Bank of America, N.A.) by Bank of America, N.A. (Edwards, Joe)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong pdf attached; Correction: attached correct pdf (Re: #10 Summons Issued ) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Main Document 10 replaced on 11/27/2019 to provide correct document) (dlg, Dpty Clk). (dlg, Dpty Clk).
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joe Earl Edwards on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. [Note: Attorney Joe Earl Edwards added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:pla).] (Edwards, Joe)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company for Bank of America, N.A.) by Bank of America, N.A. (Harmon, Joel)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joel W Harmon on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. [Note: Attorney Joel W Harmon added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:pla).] (Harmon, Joel)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Bank of America, N.A. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Hearing (submitted as part of #4 ) (Re: #3 MOTION for Appointment of Receiver ) by Bank of America, N.A. (sac, Dpty Clk)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #3 MOTION for Appointment of Receiver ) by Bank of America, N.A. (Sokolosky, Alexander) Modified on 11/26/2019; this is a two-part motion of which only one part was efiled - see 6 for Motion for Hearing (sac, Dpty Clk).
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Receiver by Bank of America, N.A. (With attachments) (Sokolosky, Alexander)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants paid $400.00 filing fee, receipt number AOKNDC-2140654 by Bank of America, N.A. (With attachments) (Sokolosky, Alexander) Modified on 11/26/2019 to add receipt number (dlg, Dpty Clk).
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Bank of America, N.A. (Sokolosky, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Roberts Auto Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts Ford Lincoln, LLC
Represented By: Garry Michael Gaskins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firstar Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Marcus N Ratcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bamo Land, LLC
Represented By: Garry Michael Gaskins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primalend Capital Partners, LP
Represented By: Courtney Jo Davis Powell
Represented By: Jacob Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Level VI Properties, LLC
Represented By: Garry Michael Gaskins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvest Equipment Finance, A division of Arvest Bank
Represented By: Robert P Skeith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RWR Rentals, LLC
Represented By: Garry Michael Gaskins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts Auto Center, LLC
Represented By: Garry Michael Gaskins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Scott Roberts
Represented By: Garry Michael Gaskins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Alexander Sokolosky
Represented By: Joel W Harmon
Represented By: Joe Earl Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?