Oklahoma Turnpike Authority v. 0.70 acres of land, more or less, situated in Tulsa County, Oklahoma et al
Plaintiff: Oklahoma Turnpike Authority
Defendant: United States Department of Interior, Bureau of Indian Affairs, Arthur Dale Postoak, FRW Investments, Inc., Tulsa County Board of County Commissioners, Central Light and Fuel Company, The, Tulsa County Treasurer, Occupants of 3349 South 57th West Ave, Tulsa, Oklahoma, Gulf Pipeline Company, Monty Postoak, 0.70 acres of land, more or less, situated in Tulsa County, Oklahoma, Arthur Elwin Postoak and Occupants of 3353 South 57th West Ave, Tulsa Oklahoma
Case Number: 4:2019cv00640
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Cathryn Dawn McClanahan on behalf of United States Department of Interior, Bureau of Indian Affairs(as Trustee on behalf of Alottee Arthur E. Postoak, a/k/a Arthur Elwin Postoak, now deceased, a full Blood Creek Indian, Roll No. NB-599), United States Department of Interior, Bureau of Indian Affairs(as Trustee on behalf of Alottee Gracie Postoak, Full Blood Creek, Roll No. 2327, now deceased) [Note: Attorney Cathryn Dawn McClanahan added to party United States Department of Interior, Bureau of Indian Affairs(pty:dft), Attorney Cathryn Dawn McClanahan added to party United States Department of Interior, Bureau of Indian Affairs(pty:dft).] (McClanahan, Cathryn)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Directing counsel Phyllis Widdows for "Occupants at 3353 S. 57th West Ave, Tulsa, OK" to file forthwith clarification as to whether the answer (Dkt. # 16) is on behalf of "Occupants at 3353 S. 57th West Ave, Tulsa, OK" ONLY, as currently docketed, and/or specifically, counsel should state whether the answer (Dkt. # 16) is as to defendant FRW Investments, Inc. also. (Re: 17 Minute Order,,,,, #2 Complaint, #16 Answer ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Directing defendant FRW Investments, Inc., d/b/a Tobacco Express Smoke Shop, named in the Complaint #1 as "Occupants of 3353 S. 57th W. Ave., Tulsa, OK," to file forthwith a separate Notice of Party Name Correction reflecting its true and correct party name. (Re: #2 Complaint, #16 Answer ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers) Modified on 1/7/2020 to correct type in address (srt, Dpty Clk).
January 6, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Occupants of 3353 South 57th West Ave, Tulsa Oklahoma (jjs, Dpty Clk)
December 17, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Tulsa County Board of County Commissioners (Wilson, Douglas)
December 17, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Douglas Allen Wilson on behalf of Tulsa County Board of County Commissioners [Note: Attorney Douglas Allen Wilson added to party Tulsa County Board of County Commissioners(pty:dft).] (Wilson, Douglas)
December 17, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF of Publication of Affidavit of Publication upon Defendants on 12/16/19 by Oklahoma Turnpike Authority (Warrick, William)
December 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE Second Notice to Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 71.1(d) (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Oklahoma Turnpike Authority (With attachments) (Warrick, William)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the motion to strike hearing #9 is granted. The 12/20/19 hearing to appoint commissioners is STRICKEN as requested. ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); granting #9 Motion to Strike Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: 5 Minute Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),,,, Ruling on Motion for Hearing, #2 Complaint, #4 MOTION for Hearing to Appoint Commissioners, #9 MOTION to Strike Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Hearing to Appoint Commissioners Set December 20, 2019 ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 Amended CERTIFICATE of Service (Re: #9 MOTION to Strike Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Hearing to Appoint Commissioners Set December 20, 2019 ) by Oklahoma Turnpike Authority (Warrick, William)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Hearing to Appoint Commissioners Set December 20, 2019 by Oklahoma Turnpike Authority (Warrick, William)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Tulsa County Treasurer (Wilson, Douglas)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Douglas Allen Wilson on behalf of Tulsa County Treasurer [Note: Attorney Douglas Allen Wilson added to party Tulsa County Treasurer(pty:dft).] (Wilson, Douglas)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to Defendants (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Oklahoma Turnpike Authority (With attachments) (Warrick, William)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the motion #4 is granted. Hearing to appoint Commissioners set for 12/20/2019 at 9:00 a.m. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Hearing set for 12/20/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan); granting #4 Motion for Hearing (Re: #2 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Hearing to Appoint Commissioners (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Oklahoma Turnpike Authority (With attachments) (Warrick, William)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William Brant Warrick on behalf of Oklahoma Turnpike Authority (Warrick, William)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2140978) by Oklahoma Turnpike Authority (With attachments) (Warrick, William)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Oklahoma Turnpike Authority (Warrick, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oklahoma Turnpike Authority v. 0.70 acres of land, more or less, situated in Tulsa County, Oklahoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior, Bureau of Indian Affairs
Represented By: Cathryn Dawn McClanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Dale Postoak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRW Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsa County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Douglas Allen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Light and Fuel Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsa County Treasurer
Represented By: Douglas Allen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occupants of 3349 South 57th West Ave, Tulsa, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Pipeline Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monty Postoak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.70 acres of land, more or less, situated in Tulsa County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Elwin Postoak
Represented By: Cathryn Dawn McClanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occupants of 3353 South 57th West Ave, Tulsa Oklahoma
Represented By: Phyllis Gae Widdows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma Turnpike Authority
Represented By: William Brant Warrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?