Dixon v. Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Plaintiff: Robbin Dixon
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Case Number: 4:2019cv00693
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The (Turner, William)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for Prudential Insurance Company of America, The) by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The (Turner, William)
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing The Prudential Insurance Company of America to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 5) is granted. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading shall be filed on February 10, 2020. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 2/10/2020); granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The (Turner, William)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William Kirk Turner on behalf of Prudential Insurance Company of America, The [Note: Attorney William Kirk Turner added to party Prudential Insurance Company of America, The(pty:dft).] (Turner, William)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Prudential Insurance Company of America, The (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Prudential Insurance Company of America, The (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2151911) by Robbin Dixon (Shook, Jonathan)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Robbin Dixon (Shook, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Represented By: William Kirk Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbin Dixon
Represented By: Jonathan Everett Shook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?