United States of America v Palms et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Reginald Promise, Natalie McCurtain Palms, Ramar Travelle Palms and Robert Palms
Case Number: 4:2019cv00698
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The government's motion for protective order (Doc. 1) is denied. The TRO (Doc. 5, 10) is dissolved, effective this 31st day of December, 2019 at 5:19 p.m ; striking/withdrawing document(s); denying #1 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Re: #5 Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Ruling on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #10 Order, ) (Documents Terminated: #5 Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Ruling on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #10 Order, ) (JED1, Chambers)
December 31, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Chief Judge John E Dowdell: Show Cause Hearing held on 12/31/2019 , taking motion(s) under advisement, striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s) (Re: #1 Temporary Restraining Order ) (Court Reporter: Terri Beeler) (With attachments) (lml, Dpty Clk)
December 31, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Dennis Allen Fries on behalf of United States of America [Note: Attorney Dennis Allen Fries added to party United States of America(pty:pla).] (Fries, Dennis)
December 31, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Douglas Edward Snow on behalf of United States of America [Note: Attorney Douglas Edward Snow added to party United States of America(pty:pla).] (Snow, Douglas)
December 30, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE (Re: #1 Temporary Restraining Order ) by Ramar Travelle Palms (With attachments) (Hofland, Andrew)
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Natalie McCurtain Palms (Re: 4 Complaint ) by United States of America (Hardcastle, Marianne)
December 30, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted re: Natalie McCurtain Palms (Re: 4 Complaint ) (alg, Dpty Clk)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Ramar Travelle Palms (Re: 4 Complaint ) (alg, Dpty Clk)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell (REDACTED ORDER) (Re: #5 Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Ruling on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #1 Temporary Restraining Order ) (lml, Dpty Clk) Modified on 1/2/2020 - DISSOLVED per #18 (sac, Dpty Clk).
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 SEALED UNREDACTED VERSION of Dkt #1 per Local Rule 5.3(b) (lml, Dpty Clk)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell After the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Complaint, and Order were filed in this case, the Court was advised that those documents contained personal identifiers. In order to comply with LCvR 5.3, the Clerk's office is directed to replace the PDF for Doc. 1 with a redacted PDF. The clerk's office will filed the document which contained personal identifiers as a Sealed Unredacted Document. A redacted Order will also be filed forthwith. (Re: #5 Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Ruling on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #1 Temporary Restraining Order, 4 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lml, Dpty Clk) Modified on 12/30/2019 to correct Local Rule number (lml, Dpty Clk).
December 30, 2019 ***Remark: copy of #10 mailed to defendant at: Ramar Travelle Palms David L Moss Detention Center 300 N DENVER TULSA OK 74103; copy of #10 placed in USM mail slot (sac, Dpty Clk)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service unexecuted (alg, Dpty Clk)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 SEALED ORDER (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Show Cause Hearing set for 12/31/2019 at 03:00 PM before Chief Judge John E Dowdell); granting #1 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (lml, Dpty Clk) Modified on 1/2/2020 - DISSOLVED per #18 (sac, Dpty Clk).
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Ramar Travelle Palms, Robert Palms, Natalie McCurtain Palms, Reginald Promise (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Submitted as Doc. #1 ) by United States of America (lml, Dpty Clk)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET (sc, Dpty Clk) Modified on 12/20/2019 to correct title of event (lml, Dpty Clk).
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (sc, Dpty Clk) Modified on 12/20/2019 to correct title of event (lml, Dpty Clk). (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/30/2019 per Minute Order # 8 ) (lml, Dpty Clk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v Palms et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald Promise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie McCurtain Palms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramar Travelle Palms
Represented By: Andrew J Hofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Palms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Marianne Smith Hardcastle
Represented By: Douglas Edward Snow
Represented By: Dennis Allen Fries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?