Roca v. PennWell Corporation
Plaintiff: John Roca
Defendant: PennWell Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00713
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 7/20/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 8/3/2020, Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/26/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Jury Trial set for 11/16/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
February 19, 2020 Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT by PennWell Corporation (Nelson, Todd)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David Paul Limekiller on behalf of PennWell Corporation [Note: Attorney David Paul Limekiller added to party PennWell Corporation(pty:dft).] (Limekiller, David)
January 29, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing PennWell Corporation to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 2/21/2020) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Clarion Events Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Clarion Events Ltd. for PennWell Corporation) by PennWell Corporation (Nelson, Todd)
January 27, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER (Re: #1 Complaint ) by PennWell Corporation (Nelson, Todd)
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Todd Alan Nelson on behalf of PennWell Corporation [Note: Attorney Todd Alan Nelson added to party PennWell Corporation(pty:dft).] (Nelson, Todd)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to PennWell Corporation by John Roca (jjs, Dpty Clk)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Richard Paul Liebowitz (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against PennWell Corporation (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2154412) by John Roca (With attachments) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roca v. PennWell Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Roca
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennWell Corporation
Represented By: David Paul Limekiller
Represented By: Todd Alan Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?