MOUSAVI v. JOHN CHRISTNER TRUCKING LLC et al
Defendant: Three Diamond Leasing, LLC
Petitioner: Kazem Mousavi
Respondent: John Christner Trucking, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019mc00014
Filed: September 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Erin Elizabeth Nulty (sc, Dpty Clk)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Mark S Morgan (sc, Dpty Clk)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing John Christner Trucking, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , changing case number to 19-MC-14-JED-FHM (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from New Jersey
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the Motion to Transfer Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoena Served on T-Mobile and Request for Order Compelling Production to the United States District Court of the Northern District of Oklahoma be and is hereby granted and Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoena Served on T-Mobile is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma; this case is closed. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED; granting #1 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 9/24/2019. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/26/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 Letter re #1 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Dated August 2, 2019 Served on T-Mobile Compliance Department ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0, #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to USDC for Northern District of Oklahoma . (MORGAN, MARK) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/26/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by KAZEM MOUSAVI re #1 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Dated August 2, 2019 Served on T-Mobile Compliance Department ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Mark Salah Morgan, #2 Exhibit 1-3 of Morgan Declaration)(MORGAN, MARK) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/26/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to USDC for Northern District of Oklahoma . Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/26/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer Case to USDC for Northern District of Oklahoma by JOHN CHRISTNER TRUCKING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(NULTY, ERIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/26/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF in Opposition filed by JOHN CHRISTNER TRUCKING LLC re #1 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Dated August 2, 2019 Served on T-Mobile Compliance Department ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Erin Nulty, #2 Exhibit 1 and 2)(NULTY, ERIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/26/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN ELIZABETH NULTY on behalf of JOHN CHRISTNER TRUCKING LLC (NULTY, ERIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/26/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Dated August 2, 2019 Served on T-Mobile Compliance Department. Motion set for 9/16/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/26/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/26/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Dated August 2, 2019 Served on T-Mobile Compliance Department ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0312-9900816.), filed by KAZEM MOUSAVI. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoena, #2 Declaration of Mark Salah Morgan, Esq., #3 Exhibit 1 and 2 to Morgan Decl., #4 Text of Proposed Order)(MORGAN, MARK) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/26/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOUSAVI v. JOHN CHRISTNER TRUCKING LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Diamond Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Christner Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Nulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kazem Mousavi
Represented By: Mark S Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?