Walker v. American Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mildred Walker
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00019
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 ***Respondent directed to show cause why the writ should not issue and file a response to the petition Responses due by 4/9/2020 Replies due by 5/11/2020 (see document number #5 ) (sac, Dpty Clk) Modified on 3/11/2020 - ENTERED IN ERROR (sac, Dpty Clk).
March 10, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #14 ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
March 10, 2020 Filing 14 JUDGMENT by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , entering judgment (terminates case) (pll, Dpty Clk)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #8 Motion to Dismiss (pll, Dpty Clk)
February 26, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) by American Airlines, Inc. ; (Imose, Anna)
February 11, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Notice); Correction: changed text to reflect correct event (Response) and create link to 8 (Re: #11 Notice (Other) ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE (Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss) by Mildred Walker (jjs, Dpty Clk) Modified on 2/11/2020 to change text to reflect correct event (sac, Dpty Clk).
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case. Defendant has filed a Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 8] which should first be resolved. (Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Counsel for Defendant is directed to provide a three-ring binder notebook for use by the Court containing a paper copy of the document, with tabbed exhibits, as filed at Doc. 8. Said paper copy shall be a complete and exact duplicate of the filing after it was filed with the Court, including the case and docket number information at the top of each page. (Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
January 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by American Airlines, Inc. (With attachments) (Imose, Anna)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent American Airlines Group Inc. for American Airlines, Inc.) by American Airlines, Inc. (Imose, Anna)
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing American Airlines, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark David Spencer on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. (Spencer, Mark)
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Anna Emem Imose on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. (Imose, Anna)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by American Airlines, Inc. (Imose, Anna)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County, case number CJ-2019-4959 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2161608) by American Airlines, Inc. (With attachments) (Imose, Anna)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by American Airlines, Inc. (Imose, Anna)
December 20, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against American Airlines, Inc. (jjs, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. American Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon P Long
Represented By: Anna Emem Imose
Represented By: Mark David Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?