United States of America v. Renfrow et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners, John Doe, County Treasurer, Rachelle Lee Renfrow and Occupants of the Premises
Case Number: 4:2020cv00034
Filed: January 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay by United States of America (Fields, Nolan)
February 26, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by County Treasurer(Craig County, Oklahoma) (With attachments) (Wagner, Todd)
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by County Treasurer(Rogers County, Oklahoma) (With attachments) (Wagner, Todd)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Board of County Commissioners(Rogers County, Oklahoma) (Wagner, Todd)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Todd Michael Wagner on behalf of Board of County Commissioners(Rogers County, Oklahoma), Board of County Commissioners(Craig County, Oklahoma), County Treasurer(Rogers County, Oklahoma), County Treasurer(Craig County, Oklahoma) [Note: Attorney Todd Michael Wagner added to party Board of County Commissioners(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Michael Wagner added to party Board of County Commissioners(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Michael Wagner added to party County Treasurer(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Michael Wagner added to party County Treasurer(pty:dft).] (Wagner, Todd)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: Attached wrong PDF; Correction: Attached correct PDF (Re: #3 Summons Issued ) (alg, Dpty Clk)
February 12, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants by United States of America (jjs, Dpty Clk) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/13/2020) (alg, Dpty Clk). Modified on 2/13/2020 to attach correct PDF (alg, Dpty Clk).
January 28, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by United States of America (With attachments) (Fields, Nolan)
January 28, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States of America (Fields, Nolan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Renfrow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Todd Michael Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Treasurer
Represented By: Todd Michael Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachelle Lee Renfrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occupants of the Premises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nolan Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?