Frakes v. OK Restaurant Holdings LLC et al
Plaintiff: Darlene Frakes
Defendant: Troy Beats, Falcon Holdings Management, LLC, CKE Restaurant Holdings, Inc., OK Restaurant Holdings LLC, Aslam Khan and Pete Pascuzzi
Case Number: 4:2020cv00099
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #28 MOTION to Remand ) by CKE Restaurant Holdings, Inc. ; (Tucker, John)
May 1, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #28 MOTION to Remand ) by Troy Beats, Falcon Holdings Management, LLC, Aslam Khan, OK Restaurant Holdings LLC ; (With attachments) (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case. Plaintiff has filed a Motion to Remand to State Court (Doc. #28 ) which should first be resolved., striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
April 23, 2020 Filing 30 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Troy Beats, Aslam Khan, OK Restaurant Holdings LLC (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
April 22, 2020 Filing 29 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stephani R. Johnson on behalf of Falcon Holdings Management, LLC [Note: Attorney Stephani R. Johnson added to party Falcon Holdings Management, LLC(pty:dft).] (Johnson, Stephani)
April 10, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Remand by Darlene Frakes (With attachments) (Aizenman, Daniel)
March 27, 2020 Filing 27 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nick Rotchadl on behalf of CKE Restaurant Holdings, Inc. [Note: Attorney Nick Rotchadl added to party CKE Restaurant Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Rotchadl, Nick)
March 27, 2020 Filing 26 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Heather Carson Perkins on behalf of CKE Restaurant Holdings, Inc. (Perkins, Heather)
March 26, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Troy Beats, Aslam Khan, OK Restaurant Holdings LLC (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 4/23/2020) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
March 25, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by CKE Restaurant Holdings, Inc. (Tucker, John)
March 19, 2020 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Falcon Holdings Management LLC for Falcon Holdings Management, LLC) by Falcon Holdings Management, LLC (Maynard, Allison)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Deadline set 3/25/2020) ; granting #19 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
March 17, 2020 Filing 20 First AMENDED ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, #9 Answer ) by Falcon Holdings Management, LLC (Maynard, Allison)
March 17, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by CKE Restaurant Holdings, Inc. (Tucker, John)
March 16, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Caleb Matthew Salmon on behalf of Darlene Frakes [Note: Attorney Caleb Matthew Salmon added to party Darlene Frakes(pty:pla).] (Salmon, Caleb)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice and ; adding attorney Heather Carson Perkins,Nick R Rotchadle for CKE Restaurant Holdings, Inc. ; granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
March 13, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent CKE Inc., Corporate Parent CKE Holding Corporation for CKE Restaurant Holdings, Inc.) by CKE Restaurant Holdings, Inc. (Tucker, John)
March 13, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nick R. Rotchadl to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2185249) by CKE Restaurant Holdings, Inc. (With attachments) (Tucker, John)
March 13, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Heather Carson Perkins to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2185245) by CKE Restaurant Holdings, Inc. (With attachments) (Tucker, John)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting relief from LCvR 83.3(a) ; granting #12 Motion for Relief (kjp, Dpty Clk)
March 13, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: filers selected in error; Correction: removed filers selected in error (Re: #11 Disclosure Statement (Corporate) ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
March 12, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Relief from Local Civil Rule 83.3 by Falcon Holdings Management, LLC (With attachments) (Maynard, Allison)
March 12, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by OK Restaurant Holdings LLC (Sharrock, Elizabeth) Modified on 3/13/2020 to remove filers selected in error (sac, Dpty Clk).
March 12, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing CKE Restaurant Holdings, Falcon Holdings Management, LLC Inc., and OK Restaurant Holdings LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
March 11, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Falcon Holdings Management, LLC (Maynard, Allison)
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE Notice of Consent to Removal by Falcon Holdings Management, LLC (Maynard, Allison)
March 11, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Allison Jayne Maynard on behalf of Falcon Holdings Management, LLC [Note: Attorney Allison Jayne Maynard added to party Falcon Holdings Management, LLC(pty:dft).] (Maynard, Allison)
March 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE Notice of Consent to Removal by Troy Beats, Aslam Khan, OK Restaurant Holdings LLC (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Rose Sharrock on behalf of Troy Beats, Aslam Khan, OK Restaurant Holdings LLC [Note: Attorney Elizabeth Rose Sharrock added to party Troy Beats(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Rose Sharrock added to party Aslam Khan(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Rose Sharrock added to party OK Restaurant Holdings LLC(pty:dft).] (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John H Tucker on behalf of CKE Restaurant Holdings, Inc. (Tucker, John)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by CKE Restaurant Holdings, Inc. (Tucker, John)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa, case number CJ-2020-265 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2184339) by CKE Restaurant Holdings, Inc. (With attachments) (Tucker, John)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by CKE Restaurant Holdings, Inc. (Tucker, John)
January 23, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by Darlene Frakes (jjs, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frakes v. OK Restaurant Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Beats
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Falcon Holdings Management, LLC
Represented By: Allison Jayne Maynard
Represented By: Stephani R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CKE Restaurant Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: John H Tucker
Represented By: Heather Carson Perkins
Represented By: Nick Rotchadl
Represented By: Nick R Rotchadle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OK Restaurant Holdings LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aslam Khan
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Pascuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Frakes
Represented By: Daniel Nathan Aizenman
Represented By: Caleb Matthew Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?