West et al v. BOKF, NA et al
Plaintiff: Suzanne West, Jeremy McMillan and Ivan Herrera
Defendant: Retirement Plan Committee of BOKF, NA, The, BOKF, NA and Cavanal Hill Investment Management, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00101
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BOKF, NA, Retirement Plan Committee of BOKF, NA, The (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Suzanne West, Jeremy McMillan, Ivan Herrera (Richter, Kai)
April 28, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing Cavanal Hill Investment Management, Inc., (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Ivan Herrera, Jeremy McMillan, Suzanne West (Richter, Kai)
April 9, 2020 Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing BOKF, NA, Retirement Plan Committee of BOKF, NA, The, and Cavanal Hill Investment Management, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
April 7, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Opening Brief in Support by Cavanal Hill Investment Management, Inc. (With attachments) (Leimbach, David)
April 7, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Opening Brief in Support by BOKF, NA, Retirement Plan Committee of BOKF, NA, The (With attachments) (Dorwart, Frederic)
April 7, 2020 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent BOKF, NA, Other Affiliate BOK Financial Corporation for Cavanal Hill Investment Management, Inc.) by Cavanal Hill Investment Management, Inc. (Burden, Jared)
April 7, 2020 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent BOK Financial Corporation for BOKF, NA) by BOKF, NA (Burden, Jared)
April 7, 2020 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David Wayne Leimbach on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney David Wayne Leimbach added to party BOKF, NA(pty:dft), Attorney David Wayne Leimbach added to party Cavanal Hill Investment Management, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Wayne Leimbach added to party Retirement Plan Committee of BOKF, NA, The(pty:dft).] (Leimbach, David)
April 7, 2020 Filing 21 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jared Michael Burden on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Jared Michael Burden added to party BOKF, NA(pty:dft), Attorney Jared Michael Burden added to party Cavanal Hill Investment Management, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jared Michael Burden added to party Retirement Plan Committee of BOKF, NA, The(pty:dft).] (Burden, Jared)
April 7, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Paul DeMuro on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Paul DeMuro added to party BOKF, NA(pty:dft), Attorney Paul DeMuro added to party Cavanal Hill Investment Management, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Paul DeMuro added to party Retirement Plan Committee of BOKF, NA, The(pty:dft).] (DeMuro, Paul)
April 7, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Frederic Dorwart on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Frederic Dorwart added to party BOKF, NA(pty:dft), Attorney Frederic Dorwart added to party Cavanal Hill Investment Management, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Frederic Dorwart added to party Retirement Plan Committee of BOKF, NA, The(pty:dft).] (Dorwart, Frederic)
March 20, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher Theophillus Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Christopher Theophillus Smith added to party Ivan Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Theophillus Smith added to party Jeremy McMillan(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Theophillus Smith added to party Suzanne West(pty:pla).] (Smith, Christopher)
March 20, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brock Specht on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Brock Specht added to party Ivan Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Brock Specht added to party Jeremy McMillan(pty:pla), Attorney Brock Specht added to party Suzanne West(pty:pla).] (Specht, Brock)
March 20, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Paul J Lukas on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Paul J Lukas added to party Ivan Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J Lukas added to party Jeremy McMillan(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J Lukas added to party Suzanne West(pty:pla).] (Lukas, Paul)
March 20, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kai H Richter on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Kai H Richter added to party Ivan Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Kai H Richter added to party Jeremy McMillan(pty:pla), Attorney Kai H Richter added to party Suzanne West(pty:pla).] (Richter, Kai)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorneys Christoper T. Smith (Doc. 5), Kai H. Richter (Doc. 6), Brock J. Specht (Doc. 7) and Paul J. Lukas (Doc. 8) are granted. Counsel may appear in this matter on behalf of the plaintiffs. ; granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
March 19, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Cavanal Hill Investment Management, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Suzanne West, Jeremy McMillan, Ivan Herrera (Hammons, Mark)
March 19, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: BOKF, NA (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Suzanne West, Jeremy McMillan, Ivan Herrera (Hammons, Mark)
March 19, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Retirement Plan Committee of BOKF, NA, The (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Suzanne West, Jeremy McMillan, Ivan Herrera (Hammons, Mark)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Edgar Hammons on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hammons, Mark)
March 18, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , Having reviewed the docket entry and/or PDF for Dkt #4, the Court has determined that the wrong pdf is attached. Attorney Mark Hammons is hereby directed to re-file this pleading styled for the United States District Court Northern District of Oklahoma with the case number of 20-CV-101-JED-FHM forthwith. (Re: #4 Appearance - Attorney ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sac, Dpty Clk)
March 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paul J. Lukas to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Paul J. Lukas (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number OKNDC-2186690) by Ivan Herrera, Jeremy McMillan, Suzanne West (With attachments) (Hammons, Mark)
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brock J. Specht to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Brock Specht (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number OKNDC-2186672) by Ivan Herrera, Jeremy McMillan, Suzanne West (With attachments) (Hammons, Mark)
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kai H. Richter to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Kai H. Richter (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number OKNDC-2186671) by Ivan Herrera, Jeremy McMillan, Suzanne West (With attachments) (Hammons, Mark)
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney(s) Christopher T. Smith to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number OKNDC-2186666) by Ivan Herrera, Jeremy McMillan, Suzanne West (With attachments) (Hammons, Mark)
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Edgar Hammons on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hammons, Mark) Modified on 3/18/2020 - ENTERED IN ERROR - wrong PDF attached - counsel directed to refile document (sac, Dpty Clk).
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (sc, Dpty Clk)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2184669) by Suzanne West, Jeremy McMillan, Ivan Herrera (Hammons, Mark)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ivan Herrera, Jeremy McMillan, Suzanne West (Hammons, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West et al v. BOKF, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retirement Plan Committee of BOKF, NA, The
Represented By: Jared Michael Burden
Represented By: David Wayne Leimbach
Represented By: Frederic Dorwart
Represented By: Paul DeMuro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOKF, NA
Represented By: Jared Michael Burden
Represented By: David Wayne Leimbach
Represented By: Frederic Dorwart
Represented By: Paul DeMuro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cavanal Hill Investment Management, Inc.
Represented By: Jared Michael Burden
Represented By: David Wayne Leimbach
Represented By: Frederic Dorwart
Represented By: Paul DeMuro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne West
Represented By: Mark Edgar Hammons
Represented By: Christopher Theophillus Smith
Represented By: Brock Specht
Represented By: Paul J Lukas
Represented By: Kai H Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy McMillan
Represented By: Mark Edgar Hammons
Represented By: Christopher Theophillus Smith
Represented By: Brock Specht
Represented By: Paul J Lukas
Represented By: Kai H Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Herrera
Represented By: Mark Edgar Hammons
Represented By: Christopher Theophillus Smith
Represented By: Brock Specht
Represented By: Paul J Lukas
Represented By: Kai H Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?