Palmer et al v. Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Monica Palmer and Calvin Palmer
Defendant: Doubletree Hotels, LLC, Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., John Doe, Doubletree Hotels, Inc., HP Hotel Management, Inc., John Doe Corporation and Schindler Elevator Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv00113
Filed: March 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William Caleb Jones on behalf of Schindler Elevator Corporation [Note: Attorney William Caleb Jones added to party Schindler Elevator Corporation(pty:dft).] (Jones, William)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Terence Kern , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 9/24/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 10/8/2020, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/2/2021, Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Terence Kern, Jury Trial set for 3/15/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Terence Kern) (srt, Dpty Clk)
April 24, 2020 Filing 15 Joint STATUS REPORT by Calvin Palmer (Kirkland, Nevin)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 4/24/2020) (lmc, Chambers)
April 2, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. (Poovey, Joshua)
April 2, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Doubletree Hotels, LLC (Poovey, Joshua)
March 27, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Schindler Enterprises, Inc. for Schindler Elevator Corporation) by Schindler Elevator Corporation (LeBlanc, Thomas)
March 26, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Doubletree Hotels LLC, Corporate Parent Promus Hotels Parent LLC, Corporate Parent Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc for Doubletree Hotels, LLC) by Doubletree Hotels, LLC (Poovey, Joshua)
March 26, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Doubletree Hotels, Inc. (Poovey, Joshua)
March 26, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HP Hotel Management, Inc. (Poovey, Joshua)
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. (Poovey, Joshua)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Doubletree Hotels, Inc., Doubletree Hotels, LLC,HP Hotel Management, Inc., Schindler Elevator Corporation to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Thomas Adrian LeBlanc on behalf of Schindler Elevator Corporation (LeBlanc, Thomas)
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Schindler Elevator Corporation (LeBlanc, Thomas)
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County, case number CJ-2020-301 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2187960) by Doubletree Hotels, Inc., Doubletree Hotels, LLC, HP Hotel Management, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Schindler Elevator Corporation (With attachments) (LeBlanc, Thomas)
March 20, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Doubletree Hotels, Inc., Doubletree Hotels, LLC, HP Hotel Management, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Schindler Elevator Corporation (LeBlanc, Thomas)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss (filed in state court) by Doubletree Hotels, Inc. (alg, Dpty Clk)
January 27, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by Calvin Palmer, Monica Palmer (alg, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer et al v. Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doubletree Hotels, LLC
Represented By: John Christopher Davis
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Poovey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: John Christopher Davis
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Poovey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doubletree Hotels, Inc.
Represented By: John Christopher Davis
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Poovey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP Hotel Management, Inc.
Represented By: John Christopher Davis
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Poovey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schindler Elevator Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Adrian LeBlanc
Represented By: William Caleb Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Palmer
Represented By: Nevin Ray Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Palmer
Represented By: Nevin Ray Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?