Smith v. PacerMonitor, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Smith
Defendant: Oklahoma Attorney General, PacerMonitor, LLC and Tulsa County District Attorney
Case Number: 4:2020cv00126
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Tulsa Office
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Filing 21 APPEAL FEES Paid in Full (Re: #18 Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court ) by Pamela Smith (alg, Dpty Clk)
May 6, 2020 ***Remark: copy of receipt emailed to the 10th Circuit (Re: #21 Appeal Fee Paid in Full ) (alg, Dpty Clk)
April 23, 2020 Filing 20 APPEAL NUMBER INFORMATION from Circuit Court assigning Case Number 20-5042 (#18) (Re: #18 Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court ) (sc, Dpty Clk)
April 22, 2020 Filing 19 PRELIMINARY RECORD Sent to Circuit Court (Re: #18 Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court ) (alg, Dpty Clk)
April 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Circuit Court (Re: #14 Opinion and Order, #15 Judgment, Dismissing/Terminating Case, ) by Pamela Smith (alg, Dpty Clk)
April 7, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Oklahoma Attorney General (Re: #1 Complaint, ) by Pamela Smith (sc, Dpty Clk)
April 7, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Tulsa County District Attorney (Re: #1 Complaint, ) by Pamela Smith (sc, Dpty Clk)
April 3, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #14 ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
April 3, 2020 Filing 15 JUDGMENT by Judge Claire V Eagan (JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL), dismissing/terminating case (terminates case) (Re: #14 Opinion and Order, ) (RGG, Chambers)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan dismissing plaintiff's complaint (Dkt. # 1) (Re: 12 Minute Order, Changing Case Number, #1 Complaint, ) (RGG, Chambers)
April 1, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (sc, Dpty Clk)
March 27, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , changing case number to 20-CV-126-CVE-FHM (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
March 27, 2020 Filing 11 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from New York Southern
March 20, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of Oklahoma. (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TRANSFER ORDER: Having received no objections to the Court's Transfer Order dated February 12, 2020 (Dkt. No. 9), the Court concludes that it is in the interest of justice for this case to be transferred to the Northern District of Oklahoma in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Accordingly, the Court hereby orders that this case be transferred to the Northern District of Oklahoma. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to transmit the docket in this case to the Northern District of Oklahoma. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 3/20/2020) (jca) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Received Return Receipt of #9 Order, as to Pamela Smith, P.O. Box 470261, Tulsa, OK 74147, which was served by Certified Mail # 7018 1830 0001 1674 5879, no date on the Return Receipt Requested. (vn) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TRANSFER ORDER: For the reasons stated above, transfer of this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma is appropriate. Pursuant to Rule 72(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court will delay issuing the order of transfer to allow Smith 17 days (including weekends and holidays) from service of this Order (which includes three days because the Order is being mailed to Plaintiff) to file any objections. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), (b), (d). Such objections shall be filed with the Clerk of Court, with courtesy copies delivered to the chambers of the Honorable Paul A. Engelmayer and to the chambers of the undersigned, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York10007. In the absence of any objections, the Court will direct the Clerk, by separate order issued after March 2, 2020, to effectuate the transfer. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this transfer order to Smith by certified mail and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 2/12/2020) (jca) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Mailed a copy of #9 Order, to Pamela Smith P.O. Box 470261 Tulsa, OK 74147 by Certified Mail # 7018 1830 0001 1674 5879 with Return Receipt Requested. (aea) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Pamela Smith Pro-Se dated 1/27/2020 re: I apologize for sending this information three times with amendments to get the information to you correctly for you to make an informed decision based on evidence that I have presented to the courts, and as further specified in this letter. Document filed by Pamela Smith. (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Pamela Smith, dated 1/24/20 re: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: OBSTRUCTION OF JUSTICE, COVER-UP, DESTROYING EVIDENCE(GLASS SALT SHAKER WITH DNA), DESTROYING DOCUMENTS, THREATENING FEDERAL WITNESSES, TWO POLYGRAPHS(ONE BY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, OCTOBER 13, AND ONE BY OKLAHOMA HIGHWAY PATROL, JANUARY OR FEBRUARY 1999), ABUSE OF POWER ETC. Document filed by Pamela Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Pamela Smith dated 1/25/2020 re: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Document filed by Pamela Smith.(va) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: For the reasons set forth herein, Smith is hereby ordered to show cause why this case should not be transferred to either the Western or Northern District of Oklahoma. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Smith by certified mail and note service on the docket. Smith is directed to respond to the order to show cause as detailed in this order no later than February 5, 2020. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. Show Cause Response due by 2/5/2020. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 1/6/2020) (jca) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Mailed a copy of #5 Order to Show Cause, to Pamela Smith P.O. Box 470261 Tulsa, OK 74147 by certified mail no. 7019 1120 0000 8895 0195 with return receipt requested. (vba) Modified on 1/6/2020 (vba). [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/2/2020) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oklahoma Attorney General, PacerMonitor, LLC, Tulsa County District Attorney. (Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number 465401251392) Document filed by Pamela Smith. (sac) Modified on 1/31/2020 (sac). [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. PacerMonitor, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PacerMonitor, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsa County District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?