Bugbros Pest Control, LLC v. Bug Brothers LLC
Plaintiff: Bugbros Pest Control, LLC
Defendant: Bug Brothers LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00164
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Martin G Ozinga on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ozinga, Martin)
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Bug Brothers LLC (sc, Dpty Clk)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks (jjs, Dpty Clk)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Bugbros Pest Control, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Cody Jarrett Cooper on behalf of Bugbros Pest Control, LLC (Cooper, Cody)
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bugbros Pest Control, LLC (Cooper, Cody)
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Bugbros Pest Control, LLC (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2199375) by Bugbros Pest Control, LLC (Cooper, Cody) Modified on 4/24/2020 to add filing fee receipt information (jjs, Dpty Clk).
April 24, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Bugbros Pest Control, LLC [Note: Attorney Cody Jarrett Cooper added to party Bugbros Pest Control, LLC(pty:pla).] (Cooper, Cody)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bugbros Pest Control, LLC v. Bug Brothers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bugbros Pest Control, LLC
Represented By: Martin G Ozinga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bug Brothers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?