Voge v. Essentia Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Perri Voge
Defendant: Markel Insurance Company and Essentia Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00168
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Essentia Insurance Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
June 3, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for Essentia Insurance Company) by Essentia Insurance Company (Butler, Roger)
June 3, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Essentia Insurance Company (Butler, Roger)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 7/1/2020) (lmc, Chambers)
June 2, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Markel Insurance Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; adding party Essentia Insurance Company terminating party Markel Insurance Company (a Foreign For-Profit Insurance Corporation) ; granting #7 Motion to Substitute Party (lmc, Chambers)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party by Markel Insurance Company (Smith, Nathaniel)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nathaniel Thomas Smith on behalf of Markel Insurance Company [Note: Attorney Nathaniel Thomas Smith added to party Markel Insurance Company(pty:dft).] (Smith, Nathaniel)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Roger Neal Butler, Jr on behalf of Markel Insurance Company [Note: Attorney Roger Neal Butler, Jr added to party Markel Insurance Company(pty:dft).] (Butler, Roger)
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Markel Insurance Company (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Perri Voge (Smolen, Donald)
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Markel Insurance Company (alg, Dpty Clk)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Markel Insurance Company (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2199312) by Perri Voge (Smolen, Donald)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Perri Voge (Smolen, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Voge v. Essentia Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perri Voge
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markel Insurance Company
Represented By: Roger Neal Butler, Jr
Represented By: Nathaniel Thomas Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essentia Insurance Company
Represented By: Roger Neal Butler, Jr
Represented By: Nathaniel Thomas Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?