Reynolds v. Retail Concepts, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Reynolds
Defendant: Retail Concepts, Inc., David Kramer and Sun
Case Number: 4:2020cv00180
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Remand ) by Patricia Reynolds ; (Ingle, J)
June 17, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Remand ) by Darrin Kramer, Retail Concepts, Inc. ; (Hill, Theresa)
June 17, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk pursuant to General Order 20-14, reassigning case to Judge John F Heil, III, Judge Claire V Eagan no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 20-cv-180-JFH-FHM (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (crp, Dpty Clk)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the motion #15 is granted; Initial disclosures and joint status report due 14 days after ruling on #12 Motion to Remand, if denied. ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); granting #15 Motion to File Document Out of Time (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
June 15, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to File Initial Disclosures & Joint Status Report Out of Time by Patricia Reynolds (Harmon, Timothy)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the motion #13 is granted. Plaintiff's responses to the motions to dismiss [9, 10] are due 14 days from the Court's ruling on the motion to remand #12 , if denied. ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Remand , #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
May 28, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Patricia Reynolds (Ingle, J)
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by Patricia Reynolds (With attachments) (Ingle, J)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 6/15/2020) (RGG, Chambers)
May 7, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Retail Concepts, Inc. (With attachments) (Hill, Theresa)
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Darrin Kramer (With attachments) (Hill, Theresa)
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 JURY DEMAND by Retail Concepts, Inc. (Hill, Theresa)
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brian Michael Keester on behalf of Darrin Kramer, Retail Concepts, Inc. [Note: Attorney Brian Michael Keester added to party Darrin Kramer(pty:dft).] (Keester, Brian)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Retail Concepts, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Retail Concepts, Inc. (Hill, Theresa)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Theresa Noble Hill on behalf of Darrin Kramer, Retail Concepts, Inc. [Note: Attorney Theresa Noble Hill added to party Darrin Kramer(pty:dft).] (Hill, Theresa) Modified on 5/1/2020 to correct party name (sc, Dpty Clk).
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Retail Concepts, Inc. (Hill, Theresa)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2020-1188 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2201729) by Retail Concepts, Inc. (With attachments) (Hill, Theresa)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Retail Concepts, Inc. (Hill, Theresa)
March 20, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against David Kramer, Retail Concepts, Inc. by Patricia Reynolds (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Retail Concepts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retail Concepts, Inc.
Represented By: Theresa Noble Hill
Represented By: Brian Michael Keester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kramer
Represented By: Theresa Noble Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun
Represented By: Theresa Noble Hill
Represented By: Brian Michael Keester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Reynolds
Represented By: Timothy S Harmon
Represented By: J Derek Ingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?