Patrick et al v. Stand-By-Personnel et al
Plaintiff: Frances Patrick, Scott James Patrick and Dustin Taylor
Defendant: Saint Francis Health System, Inc. and Stand-By-Personnel
Case Number: 4:2020cv00185
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Service by Stand-By-Personnel (Mareschal, Joshua)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (Initial), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 12/31/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 2/4/2021, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/22/2021, Pretrial Conference set for 3/29/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Jury Trial set for 4/19/2021 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) (crp, Dpty Clk)
June 18, 2020 Filing 17 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Frances Patrick, Scott James Patrick, Dustin Taylor (Terrill, Steven)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 6/18/2020) (RGG, Chambers)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that attorney Joshua L. Mareschal's motion to waive local counsel requirement #6 is granted, and he may represent defendant Stand-By Personnel in this matter. ; granting #6 Motion to Waive (Re: #6 MOTION to Waive Local Counsel Requirement, #4 Letter re: Local Counsel Requirement ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
May 18, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Saint Francis Health System, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
May 15, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk randomly reassigning case due to conflict, recusing Chief Judge John E Dowdell. Judge Claire V Eagan reassigned to case., changing case number to 20-CV-185-CVE-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lml, Dpty Clk)
May 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Saint Francis Health System, Inc. (Evans, Kristen)
May 14, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kristen Pence Evans on behalf of Saint Francis Health System, Inc. (Evans, Kristen)
May 14, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Saint Francis Health System, Inc. (O'Connor, William)
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Saint Francis Health System, Inc. (O'Connor, William)
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William Walker O'Connor on behalf of Saint Francis Health System, Inc. [Note: Attorney William Walker O'Connor added to party Saint Francis Health System, Inc.(pty:dft).] (O'Connor, William)
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stand-By-Personnel (Mareschal, Joshua)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Waive Local Counsel Requirement by Stand-By-Personnel (Mareschal, Joshua)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Stand-By-Personnel to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Joshua L Mareschal (jjs, Dpty Clk)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Stand-By-Personnel (Mareschal, Joshua)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County Court, case number CJ-2019-04425 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2203035) by Stand-By-Personnel (With attachments) (Mareschal, Joshua)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Stand-By-Personnel (Mareschal, Joshua)
November 12, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Scott James Patrick, Frances Patrick, Dustin Taylor (jjs, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick et al v. Stand-By-Personnel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Francis Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen Pence Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stand-By-Personnel
Represented By: Joshua Lee Mareschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Patrick
Represented By: Steven James Terrill
Represented By: John Spencer Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott James Patrick
Represented By: Steven James Terrill
Represented By: John Spencer Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Taylor
Represented By: Steven James Terrill
Represented By: John Spencer Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?