Yeager v. Tiger Commissary Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: April Yeager
Defendant: Tiger Commissary Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00191
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 18 Second CERTIFICATE of Service by Tiger Commissary Services, Inc. (Mareschal, Joshua)
June 26, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Service by Tiger Commissary Services, Inc. (Mareschal, Joshua)
June 17, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Service by Tiger Commissary Services, Inc. (Mareschal, Joshua)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 12/30/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 1/13/2021, Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/26/2021, Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Jury Trial set for 5/17/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
June 2, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong attorney logged in to file appearance; Correction: added attorney Gary L Richardson to docket sheet (Re: #13 Appearance - Attorney ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
June 1, 2020 Filing 14 JOINT STATUS REPORT by April Yeager (Gray, Stephen)
June 1, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gary L Richardson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gray, Stephen) Modified on 6/2/2020 to change name of attorney making appearance (sac, Dpty Clk).
June 1, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stephen P Gray on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gray, Stephen)
May 28, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service by Tiger Commissary Services, Inc. (Mareschal, Joshua)
May 27, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service by Tiger Commissary Services, Inc. (Mareschal, Joshua)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 6/1/2020) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #7 Motion to Waive (lah, Chambers)
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Waive Local Counsel Requirement by Tiger Commissary Services, Inc. (Mareschal, Joshua)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tiger Commissary Services, Inc. (Mareschal, Joshua)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Joshua L Mareschal (jjs, Dpty Clk)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Tiger Commissary Services, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT by Tiger Commissary Services, Inc. (Mareschal, Joshua)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Mayes County, case number cj-2020-70 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2203558) by Tiger Commissary Services, Inc. (With attachments) (Mareschal, Joshua)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Tiger Commissary Services, Inc. (Mareschal, Joshua)
April 6, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Tiger Commissary Services, Inc. by April Yeager (jjs, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yeager v. Tiger Commissary Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiger Commissary Services, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Lee Mareschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Yeager
Represented By: Stephen P Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?