Dugan v. Cherokee Nation Businesses, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cara Dugan
Defendant: Will Rogers Downs, LLC and Cherokee Nation Businesses, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00249
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated (Documents Terminated: #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) (see document number #14 ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
July 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Dismissal, closing case, by Cara Dugan (West, Bradley)
July 14, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Hugh Michael Robert on behalf of Cara Dugan [Note: Attorney Hugh Michael Robert added to party Cara Dugan(pty:pla).] (Robert, Hugh)
July 6, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Cherokee Nation, Corporate Parent Cherokee Nation Entertainment, L.L.C., Corporate Parent Cherokee Nation Businesses, LLC for Will Rogers Downs, LLC) by Will Rogers Downs, LLC (Russell, Clinton)
July 6, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Cherokee Nation for Cherokee Nation Businesses, LLC) by Cherokee Nation Businesses, LLC (Russell, Clinton)
June 30, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Cherokee Nation Businesses, LLC, Will Rogers Downs, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 7/29/2020) (lmc, Chambers)
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Cherokee Nation Businesses, LLC, Will Rogers Downs, LLC (With attachments) (Russell, Clinton)
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Clinton Derek Russell on behalf of Cherokee Nation Businesses, LLC, Will Rogers Downs, LLC [Note: Attorney Clinton Derek Russell added to party Cherokee Nation Businesses, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Clinton Derek Russell added to party Will Rogers Downs, LLC(pty:dft).] (Russell, Clinton)
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by R Stratton Taylor on behalf of Cherokee Nation Businesses, LLC, Will Rogers Downs, LLC [Note: Attorney R Stratton Taylor added to party Cherokee Nation Businesses, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney R Stratton Taylor added to party Will Rogers Downs, LLC(pty:dft).] (Taylor, R)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Will Rogers Downs, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Cara Dugan (West, Bradley)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Cherokee Nation Businesses, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Cara Dugan (West, Bradley)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (alg, Dpty Clk)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2214201) by Cara Dugan (West, Bradley)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Cara Dugan (West, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dugan v. Cherokee Nation Businesses, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Rogers Downs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherokee Nation Businesses, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cara Dugan
Represented By: Bradley C West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?