Spalt v. PACCAR, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Edward Taylor Spalt
Defendant: PACCAR, Inc., PACCAR Financial Corp. and Rush Truck Centers of Oklahoma, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00250
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent PACCAR, Inc. for PACCAR Financial Corp.) by PACCAR Financial Corp. [Note: Attorney Rodney Lynn Cook added to party PACCAR Financial Corp.(pty:dft).] (Cook, Rodney)
July 6, 2020 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PACCAR, Inc. (Cook, Rodney)
July 6, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Rush Truck Centers of Oklahoma, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
July 2, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing PACCAR Financial Corp. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
July 1, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rodney Lynn Cook on behalf of PACCAR, Inc. [Note: Attorney Rodney Lynn Cook added to party PACCAR, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Cook, Rodney) Modified on 7/2/2020 to remove filer not named on pdf (sac, Dpty Clk).
July 1, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Rush Enterprises, Inc. for Rush Truck Centers of Oklahoma, Inc.) by Rush Truck Centers of Oklahoma, Inc. (Grotta, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Rush Truck Centers of Oklahoma, Inc. (Grotta, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Chase Grotta on behalf of Rush Truck Centers of Oklahoma, Inc. [Note: Attorney Jeffrey Chase Grotta added to party Rush Truck Centers of Oklahoma, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Grotta, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Cary Evan Hiltgen on behalf of Rush Truck Centers of Oklahoma, Inc. [Note: Attorney Cary Evan Hiltgen added to party Rush Truck Centers of Oklahoma, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Hiltgen, Cary)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Court Clerk , directing PACCAR, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (dlg, Dpty Clk)
June 30, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by PACCAR Financial Corp., PACCAR, Inc. (Bates, Justin)
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Justin G. Bates on behalf of PACCAR Financial Corp., PACCAR, Inc. [Note: Attorney Justin G. Bates added to party PACCAR Financial Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Justin G. Bates added to party PACCAR, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Bates, Justin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Rush Truck Centers of Oklahoma, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Edward Taylor Spalt (Hodges, James)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: PACCAR, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Edward Taylor Spalt (Hodges, James)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: PACCAR Financial Corp. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Edward Taylor Spalt (Hodges, James)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (alg, Dpty Clk)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Roger K Eldredge on behalf of Edward Taylor Spalt (Eldredge, Roger)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Edward Taylor Spalt (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2214420) by Edward Taylor Spalt (With attachments) (Hodges, James)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Edward Taylor Spalt (Hodges, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spalt v. PACCAR, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACCAR, Inc.
Represented By: Rodney Lynn Cook
Represented By: Justin G. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACCAR Financial Corp.
Represented By: Rodney Lynn Cook
Represented By: Justin G. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rush Truck Centers of Oklahoma, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Chase Grotta
Represented By: Cary Evan Hiltgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Taylor Spalt
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Roger K Eldredge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?