Shawnee Tribe, The v. Mnuchin et al
Plaintiff: Shawnee Tribe, The
Defendant: David Bernhardt, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Treasury and Steven T Mnuchin
Case Number: 4:2020cv00290
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The motion to transfer is granted, and this case shall be transferred to the District Court for the District of Columbia ; dismissing/terminating case (terminates case) ; transferring case (terminates case) ; granting #20 Motion to Transfer Case to Other District (lml, Dpty Clk)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Opinion and Order (Doc. 25) is vacated as it was entered in error, vacating/setting aside order(s) (Re: #25 Opinion and Order,, Transferring Case,, Ruling on Motion to Transfer Case to Other District, ) (Documents Terminated: #25 Opinion and Order,, Transferring Case,, Ruling on Motion to Transfer Case to Other District, ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lml, Dpty Clk)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The motion to transfer is granted, and this case shall be transferred to the District Court for the District of Columbia ; transferring case ; granting #20 Motion to Transfer Case to Other District (JED1, Chambers) Modified on 7/29/2020 - VACATED per 26 (sac, Dpty Clk).
July 28, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated (Documents Terminated: #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) (see document number #25 ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
July 23, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Transfer (Re: #20 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District ) by Shawnee Tribe, The ; (Thomas, Pilar)
July 23, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) by Shawnee Tribe, The ; (Thomas, Pilar)
July 10, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: this document contains two events and that cannot be properly processed in CM/ECF; Correction: efiled Brief in Support of Motion - see 22 for entry (Re: #21 Response in Opposition to Motion, ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
July 9, 2020 Filing 22 BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #20 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District ) submitted as part of #21 by David Bernhardt, Steven T Mnuchin, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Treasury ; (sac, Dpty Clk)
July 9, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) by David Bernhardt, Steven T Mnuchin, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Treasury ; (Cholera, Kuntal) Modified on 7/10/2020; this document contains two events and cannot be properly processed in one entry - see 22 for Brief in Support (sac, Dpty Clk).
July 9, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District by David Bernhardt, Steven T Mnuchin, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Treasury (Cholera, Kuntal)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 7/9/2020, Replies due by 7/23/2020); denying #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; denying #15 Motion for Hearing (Re: #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) (lml, Dpty Clk)
June 29, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Shawnee Tribe, The (With attachments) (Thomas, Pilar)
June 26, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #15 MOTION for Hearing ) by Shawnee Tribe, The ; (Thomas, Pilar)
June 25, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE (Re: #15 Motion for Hearing ) by David Bernhardt, Steven T Mnuchin, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Treasury (Lynch, Jason) Modified on 6/25/2020 to change link information based on event edit (sac, Dpty Clk).
June 25, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Hearing (Re: #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order) by Shawnee Tribe, The (Thomas, Pilar) Modified on 6/25/2020 to change event and create link to #3 (sac, Dpty Clk).
June 25, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Notice - Other); Correction: changed event (Motion for Hearing) (Re: #15 MOTION for Hearing ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
June 22, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nicole Simmons on behalf of Shawnee Tribe, The [Note: Attorney Nicole Simmons added to party Shawnee Tribe, The(pty:pla).] (Simmons, Nicole)
June 22, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Pilar Thomas on behalf of Shawnee Tribe, The [Note: Attorney Pilar Thomas added to party Shawnee Tribe, The(pty:pla).] (Thomas, Pilar)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice (Doc. 8) is granted. Attorneys Pilar M. Thomas and Nicole L. Simmons may appear in this matter on behalf of the plaintiff. ; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kuntal Cholera on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party David Bernhardt(pty:dft), Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party Steven T Mnuchin(pty:dft), Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party United States Department of the Interior(pty:dft), Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party United States Department of the Treasury(pty:dft).] (Cholera, Kuntal)
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to United States Attorney's Office, The (alg, Dpty Clk)
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) by Shawnee Tribe, The ; (Bigler, Gregory)
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Pilar M. Thomas; Nicole L. Simmons to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2222320) by Shawnee Tribe, The (With attachments) (Bigler, Gregory)
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service by Shawnee Tribe, The (Bigler, Gregory)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Intent to Oppose #3 Ex Parte Mot. for TRO by David Bernhardt, Steven T Mnuchin, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Treasury (With attachments) (Lynch, Jason)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason Lynch on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Jason Lynch added to party David Bernhardt(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Lynch added to party Steven T Mnuchin(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Lynch added to party United States Department of the Interior(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Lynch added to party United States Department of the Treasury(pty:dft).] (Lynch, Jason)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (alg, Dpty Clk)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Shawnee Tribe, The (With attachments) (Bigler, Gregory) . Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 6/29/2020 (lml, Dpty Clk).
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2221807) by Shawnee Tribe, The (With attachments) (Bigler, Gregory)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Shawnee Tribe, The (Bigler, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shawnee Tribe, The v. Mnuchin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Represented By: Jason Lynch
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Jason Lynch
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury
Represented By: Jason Lynch
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T Mnuchin
Represented By: Jason Lynch
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawnee Tribe, The
Represented By: Gregory H Bigler
Represented By: Pilar Thomas
Represented By: Nicole Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?