GWACS Armory, LLC v. KE Arms, LLC et al
Plaintiff: GWACS Armory, LLC
Defendant: Shawn Nealon, Brownells, Inc., KE Arms, LLC, Russell Phagan and Sinistral Shooting Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00341
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Alexander K. Calaway on behalf of Brownells, Inc., KE Arms, LLC, Shawn Nealon, Russell Phagan, Sinistral Shooting Technologies, LLC [Note: Attorney Alexander K. Calaway added to party Brownells, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Alexander K. Calaway added to party KE Arms, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander K. Calaway added to party Shawn Nealon(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander K. Calaway added to party Russell Phagan(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander K. Calaway added to party Sinistral Shooting Technologies, LLC(pty:dft).] (Calaway, Alexander)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brian R. Hardy on behalf of Brownells, Inc., KE Arms, LLC, Shawn Nealon, Russell Phagan, Sinistral Shooting Technologies, LLC [Note: Attorney Brian R. Hardy added to party Brownells, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Brian R. Hardy added to party KE Arms, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Brian R. Hardy added to party Shawn Nealon(pty:dft), Attorney Brian R. Hardy added to party Russell Phagan(pty:dft), Attorney Brian R. Hardy added to party Sinistral Shooting Technologies, LLC(pty:dft).] (Hardy, Brian)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sinistral Shooting Technologies, LLC (Fitz-Patrick, Robert)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by KE Arms, LLC (Fitz-Patrick, Robert)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent 2nd Adventure Group, Inc. for Brownells, Inc. ) by Brownells, Inc. (Fitz-Patrick, Robert)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Brownells, Inc., KE Arms, LLC, Shawn Nealon, Russell Phagan, Sinistral Shooting Technologies, LLC (Fitz-Patrick, Robert)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JOINDER in Motion (Re: #17 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District or Alternatively Stay Proceedings, 19 MOTION to Stay (submitted as part of #17 ) ) by Brownells, Inc., Shawn Nealon, Russell Phagan, Sinistral Shooting Technologies, LLC (Fitz-Patrick, Robert)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing KE Arms, LLC; Sinistral Shooting Technologies, LLC and Brownells, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: this is a two-part motion of which only one part was efiled; Correction: efiled Motion to Stay - see 19 (Re: #17 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District or Alternatively Stay Proceedings ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Stay (submitted as part of #17 ) by KE Arms, LLC (sac, Dpty Clk)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District or Alternatively Stay Proceedings by KE Arms, LLC (With attachments) (Fitz-Patrick, Robert) Modified on 8/26/2020; this is a two-part motion of which one part was efiled - see 19 for Motion to Stay (sac, Dpty Clk).
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that Brian Richard Hardy and Alexander K. Calaway are admitted pro hac vice for the limited purpose of representing defendants in this matter. ; granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (RGG, Chambers)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the unopposed motion #12 is granted. Defendants shall file their answer(s) or other responsive pleadings no later than 9/1/2020. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 9/1/2020); granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Alexander K. Calaway to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2253865) by Brownells, Inc., KE Arms, LLC, Shawn Nealon, Russell Phagan, Sinistral Shooting Technologies, LLC (With attachments) (Fitz-Patrick, Robert)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brian Richard Hardy to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2253864) by Brownells, Inc., KE Arms, LLC, Shawn Nealon, Russell Phagan, Sinistral Shooting Technologies, LLC (With attachments) (Fitz-Patrick, Robert)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Brownells, Inc., KE Arms, LLC, Shawn Nealon, Russell Phagan, Sinistral Shooting Technologies, LLC (Fitz-Patrick, Robert)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert P Fitz-Patrick on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Robert P Fitz-Patrick added to party Brownells, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Robert P Fitz-Patrick added to party KE Arms, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert P Fitz-Patrick added to party Shawn Nealon(pty:dft), Attorney Robert P Fitz-Patrick added to party Russell Phagan(pty:dft), Attorney Robert P Fitz-Patrick added to party Sinistral Shooting Technologies, LLC(pty:dft).] (Fitz-Patrick, Robert)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tadd Justin Pace Bogan on behalf of GWACS Armory, LLC (Bogan, Tadd)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Shawn Nealon (Re: #2 Complaint ) by GWACS Armory, LLC (Weger, James)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: KE Arms, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by GWACS Armory, LLC (Weger, James)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Brownells, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by GWACS Armory, LLC (Weger, James) Modified on 8/12/2020 to correct party served (srt, Dpty Clk).
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GWACS Armory, LLC (Weger, James)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James E Weger on behalf of GWACS Armory, LLC (Weger, James)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (alg, Dpty Clk)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing GWACS Armory, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2234357) by GWACS Armory, LLC (With attachments) (Weger, James)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by GWACS Armory, LLC (Weger, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GWACS Armory, LLC v. KE Arms, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Nealon
Represented By: Alexander K. Calaway
Represented By: Brian R. Hardy
Represented By: Robert P Fitz-Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brownells, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander K. Calaway
Represented By: Brian R. Hardy
Represented By: Robert P Fitz-Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KE Arms, LLC
Represented By: Alexander K. Calaway
Represented By: Brian R. Hardy
Represented By: Robert P Fitz-Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Phagan
Represented By: Alexander K. Calaway
Represented By: Brian R. Hardy
Represented By: Robert P Fitz-Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinistral Shooting Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Alexander K. Calaway
Represented By: Brian R. Hardy
Represented By: Robert P Fitz-Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GWACS Armory, LLC
Represented By: James E Weger
Represented By: Tadd Justin Pace Bogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?