Maxine W Driscoll Trust, The et al v. Montgomery et al
Plaintiff: Maxine W Driscoll and Maxine W Driscoll Trust, The
Defendant: James T Montgomery, Diana E Montgomery and Blueview Outpost LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00409
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Notice); Correction: changed event (Motion to Withdraw Document) (Re: #22 MOTION to Withdraw Document(s) ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Judge John F Heil, III : granting defendants' motion to withdraw attorneys ; terminating attorney Mary Hope Forsyth and John David Russell ; granting #20 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
September 29, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Withdraw Document (Re: #18 MOTION to Stay Proceedings ) by Maxine W Driscoll, Maxine W Driscoll Trust, The (Kernan, Patrick) Modified on 9/30/2020 to change event (sac, Dpty Clk).
September 29, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE Notice of Bankruptcy Dismissal & Lifting of Stay (Re: #17 Response in Opposition to Motion, #18 MOTION to Stay Proceedings ) by Maxine W Driscoll, Maxine W Driscoll Trust, The (With attachments) (Kernan, Patrick)
September 29, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Brief in Support of Motion); Correction: changed text to reflect correct event (Reply to Response to Motion) (Re: #19 Brief in Support of Motion, ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
September 29, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) by Blueview Outpost LLC, Diana E Montgomery, James T Montgomery (Russell, John)
September 28, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (submitted as part of #13 ) ) by Blueview Outpost LLC ; (Rother, Timila) Modified on 9/29/2020 to change text to reflect correct event (sac, Dpty Clk).
September 17, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Maxine W Driscoll, Maxine W Driscoll Trust, The (Kernan, Patrick)
September 14, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (submitted as part of #13 ) ) by Maxine W Driscoll, Maxine W Driscoll Trust, The ; (With attachments) (Kernan, Patrick)
August 25, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Maxine W Driscoll Trust, The (Kernan, Patrick)
August 25, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Patrick Hoyt Kernan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kernan, Patrick)
August 25, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: this is a two-part motion of which only one part was efiled; Correction: efiled Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - see 14 (Re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (submitted as part of #13 ) by Blueview Outpost LLC (sac, Dpty Clk)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Blueview Outpost LLC (With attachments) (Rother, Timila) Modified on 8/25/2020; this is a two-part motion of which one part was efiled - see 14 for Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (sac, Dpty Clk).
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Diana E Montgomery (Rother, Timila)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 SUGGESTION of Bankruptcy as to Defendants James T. Montgomery and Diana E. Montgomery by Diana E Montgomery, James T Montgomery (With attachments) (Rother, Timila)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blueview Outpost LLC (Rother, Timila)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Paige Alyssa Masters on behalf of Blueview Outpost LLC, Diana E Montgomery, James T Montgomery [Note: Attorney Paige Alyssa Masters added to party Blueview Outpost LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Paige Alyssa Masters added to party Diana E Montgomery(pty:dft), Attorney Paige Alyssa Masters added to party James T Montgomery(pty:dft).] (Masters, Paige)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Timila Stacy Rother on behalf of Blueview Outpost LLC, Diana E Montgomery, James T Montgomery [Note: Attorney Timila Stacy Rother added to party Blueview Outpost LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Timila Stacy Rother added to party Diana E Montgomery(pty:dft), Attorney Timila Stacy Rother added to party James T Montgomery(pty:dft).] (Rother, Timila)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing The Maxine W Driscoll Trust to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Blueview Outpost LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mary Hope Forsyth on behalf of Blueview Outpost LLC, Diana E Montgomery, James T Montgomery [Note: Attorney Mary Hope Forsyth added to party Blueview Outpost LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Hope Forsyth added to party Diana E Montgomery(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Hope Forsyth added to party James T Montgomery(pty:dft).] (Forsyth, Mary)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John David Russell on behalf of Blueview Outpost LLC, Diana E Montgomery, James T Montgomery (Russell, John)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Blueview Outpost LLC (Russell, John)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County (Okla.) District Court, case number CJ-2020-02314 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2249400) by Blueview Outpost LLC (With attachments) (Russell, John)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Blueview Outpost LLC (Russell, John)
July 27, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by Maxine W Driscoll Trust, The, Maxine W Driscoll (jjs, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxine W Driscoll Trust, The et al v. Montgomery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James T Montgomery
Represented By: John David Russell
Represented By: Mary Hope Forsyth
Represented By: Timila Stacy Rother
Represented By: Paige Alyssa Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana E Montgomery
Represented By: John David Russell
Represented By: Mary Hope Forsyth
Represented By: Timila Stacy Rother
Represented By: Paige Alyssa Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blueview Outpost LLC
Represented By: John David Russell
Represented By: Mary Hope Forsyth
Represented By: Timila Stacy Rother
Represented By: Paige Alyssa Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxine W Driscoll
Represented By: Patrick Hoyt Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxine W Driscoll Trust, The
Represented By: Patrick Hoyt Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?