Zoellner et al v. Bynum et al
Plaintiff: James J DeCristofaro, Clay Clark, Robert Zoellner, Stephen N Currington, Aaron A Antis, Jason Dane Malik Beasley and Debbie L Antis
Defendant: Bruce Dart, Tulsa Department of Health, The, City of Tulsa, The, George Theron Bynum, IV, Tulsa City Council, The, Jeannie Cue, Vanessa Hall-Harper, Lori Decter Wright, Ben Kimbro, Phil Lakin, Jr, Crista Patrick and Kara Joy McKee
Case Number: 4:2020cv00410
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern granting Defendants Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Amended Complaint (Doc. 20) pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 15(a)(1)(2). ; granting #20 Motion to Strike Document(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
September 15, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Strike Document(s) (Re: #18 Amended Complaint ) by City of Tulsa, The (Gray, Kristina)
September 14, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants by Clay Clark (sc, Dpty Clk)
September 14, 2020 Filing 18 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Stephen N Currington, James J DeCristofaro, Jason Dane Malik Beasley, Clay Clark, Aaron A Antis, Robert Zoellner, Debbie L Antis (sc, Dpty Clk) Modified on 9/16/2020- STRICKEN per 21 (srt, Dpty Clk).
September 10, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: not all filers were selected; Correction: added filer (Bruce Dart) (Re: #13 Appearance - Attorney, ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
September 9, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Tulsa, The (Gray, Kristina)
September 9, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jon Douglas Starr on behalf of Bruce Dart, Tulsa Department of Health, The [Note: Attorney Jon Douglas Starr added to party Bruce Dart(pty:dft), Attorney Jon Douglas Starr added to party Tulsa Department of Health, The(pty:dft).] (Starr, Jon)
September 9, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Bruce Dart (Bowlby, Bradley)
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Tulsa Department of Health, The (Bowlby, Bradley)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bradley E Bowlby on behalf of Bruce Dart, Tulsa Department of Health, The [Note: Attorney Bradley E Bowlby added to party Tulsa Department of Health, The(pty:dft).] (Bowlby, Bradley) Modified on 9/10/2020 to add filer (sac, Dpty Clk).
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gerald M Bender on behalf of George Theron Bynum, IV, City of Tulsa, The, Tulsa City Council, The [Note: Attorney Gerald M Bender added to party George Theron Bynum, IV(pty:dft), Attorney Gerald M Bender added to party City of Tulsa, The(pty:dft), Attorney Gerald M Bender added to party Tulsa City Council, The(pty:dft).] (Bender, Gerald)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Party Mayor George Theron Bynum IV by George Theron Bynum, IV (Gray, Kristina)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Party Tulsa City Council by Tulsa City Council, The (With attachments) (Gray, Kristina)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kristina L Gray on behalf of George Theron Bynum, IV, City of Tulsa, The, Tulsa City Council, The [Note: Attorney Kristina L Gray added to party George Theron Bynum, IV(pty:dft), Attorney Kristina L Gray added to party City of Tulsa, The(pty:dft), Attorney Kristina L Gray added to party Tulsa City Council, The(pty:dft).] (Gray, Kristina)
August 21, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Summons Returned Unexecuted); Correction: corrected event (Summons Returned Executed) (Re: #5 Summons Returned Unexecuted ) (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Tulsa Department of Health, The (Re: #1 Complaint ) by James J DeCristofaro (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: City of Tulsa, The (Re: #1 Complaint ) by James J DeCristofaro (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Bruce Dart (Re: #1 Complaint ) by James J DeCristofaro (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: George Theron Bynum, IV (Re: #1 Complaint ) by James J DeCristofaro (sc, Dpty Clk) Modified on 8/21/2020 to correct event (sc, Dpty Clk).
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Tulsa City Council, The (Re: #1 Complaint ) by James J DeCristofaro (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 FILING FEES Paid in Full by Aaron A Antis, Debbie L Antis, Jason Dane Malik Beasley, Clay Clark, Stephen N Currington, James J DeCristofaro, Robert Zoellner (jjs, Dpty Clk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants by Stephen N Currington, James J DeCristofaro, Jason Dane Malik Beasley, Clay Clark, Aaron A Antis, Robert Zoellner, Debbie L Antis (jjs, Dpty Clk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Stephen N Currington, James J DeCristofaro, Jason Dane Malik Beasley, Clay Clark, Aaron A Antis, Robert Zoellner, Debbie L Antis (jjs, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zoellner et al v. Bynum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Dart
Represented By: Jon Douglas Starr
Represented By: Bradley E Bowlby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsa Department of Health, The
Represented By: Jon Douglas Starr
Represented By: Bradley E Bowlby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tulsa, The
Represented By: Gerald M Bender
Represented By: Kristina L Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Theron Bynum, IV
Represented By: Gerald M Bender
Represented By: Kristina L Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsa City Council, The
Represented By: Gerald M Bender
Represented By: Kristina L Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannie Cue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Hall-Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Decter Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Kimbro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Lakin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crista Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kara Joy McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J DeCristofaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clay Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Zoellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen N Currington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron A Antis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Dane Malik Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie L Antis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?