Brown v. Ludi-Leitch
Plaintiff: James D Brown
Defendant: Ludi-Leitch
Case Number: 4:2020cv00411
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 ***Remark: Clerk's Office remailed docket #5 and #6 to James Brown new address: 1411 Hensley Blvd Bartlesville OK 74003 (Re: #5 Opinion and Order,,,,,, Ruling on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,,, Ruling on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,, Ruling on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,, Ruling on Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis,, #6 Judgment,, Dismissing/Terminating Case,,, ) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by James D Brown (sc, Dpty Clk)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 MAIL to James D Brown Returned - address has been changed to address unknown. (Re: #5 Opinion and Order,,,,,, Ruling on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,,, Ruling on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,, Ruling on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,, Ruling on Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis,, #6 Judgment,, Dismissing/Terminating Case,,, ) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
August 24, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #6 ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 JUDGMENT by Judge Claire V Eagan (JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL), dismissing/terminating case (terminates case) (Re: #5 Opinion and Order,,,,,, Ruling on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,,, Ruling on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,, Ruling on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,, Ruling on Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis,, #1 Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Plaintif's claims are dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment of dismissal is entered herewith. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. # 2) is granted, and motion for temporary restraining order (Dkt. # 3) and motion to take judicial notice (Dkt. # 4) are moot. ; finding as moot #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; finding as moot #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; finding as moot #4 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; finding as moot #4 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Re: #1 Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to take judicial notice of senior citizen elder abuse , MOTION to request criminal investigation by James D Brown (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by James D Brown (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by James D Brown (dlg, Dpty Clk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ludi-Leitch (titled as Petition for Writ of Mandamus) by James D Brown (dlg, Dpty Clk) Modified on 8/18/2020 to correct the file date (dlg, Dpty Clk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Ludi-Leitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ludi-Leitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?