Brown et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Christopher John Brown and Heather Ann Van Wyhe
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00418
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (Initial), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 4/15/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 5/20/2021, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/21/2021, Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Jury Trial set for 7/19/2021 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) (crp, Dpty Clk)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Christopher John Brown, Heather Ann Van Wyhe (McGrew, Michael)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Vahlberg, Mia)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mia Vahlberg on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company [Note: Attorney Mia Vahlberg added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft).] (Vahlberg, Mia)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 10/15/2020) (RGG, Chambers)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER (Re: #1 Complaint ) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company [Note: Attorney Stephanie Suzette Duran-Quintana added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft).] (Duran-Quintana, Stephanie)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Matthew Michael McGrew on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Matthew Michael McGrew added to party Christopher John Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Michael McGrew added to party Heather Ann Van Wyhe(pty:pla).] (McGrew, Matthew)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Dennis McGrew on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McGrew, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Christopher John Brown, Heather Ann Van Wyhe (McGrew, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2251338) by Christopher John Brown, Heather Ann Van Wyhe (McGrew, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher John Brown
Represented By: Michael Dennis McGrew
Represented By: Matthew Michael McGrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Ann Van Wyhe
Represented By: Michael Dennis McGrew
Represented By: Matthew Michael McGrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Mia Vahlberg
Represented By: Stephanie Suzette Duran-Quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?