Walker v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Deborah Lynn Walker
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2020cv00425
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Andrew Gallant on behalf of Social Security Administration [Note: Attorney Jeffrey Andrew Gallant added to party Social Security Administration(pty:dft).] (Gallant, Jeffrey)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne randomly reassigning this case upon the filing of Dkt #6 and pursuant to General Order 16-08. Reassigning case to Chief Judge John E. Dowdell and Magistrate Judge Jodi F. Jayne, changing case number to 20-cr-425-JED-JFJ (Re: #6 Statement Declining Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (Social Security) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sdc, Dpty Clk)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE of Complaint re: Social Security Administration (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) by Deborah Lynn Walker (Harlan, John)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration (alg, Dpty Clk)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT Declining Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction by Deborah Lynn Walker (Harlan, John)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne ; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kah, Chambers)
August 24, 2020 ***Remark: 3 summons in hold tray (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Court Clerk of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge [includes the following attachments: (1) a Statement as to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form, and (2) a copy of General Order 16-08] (jjs, Dpty Clk)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Deborah Lynn Walker (Harlan, John)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration by Deborah Lynn Walker (Harlan, John)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Deborah Lynn Walker (Harlan, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Lynn Walker
Represented By: John Lowell Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Jeffrey Andrew Gallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?