Thomas v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Thomas
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc and Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Case Number: 4:2020cv00443
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Tulsa Office
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell staying case until 12/22/2020 ; staying case; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): if case is not resolved, Joint Status Report due 1/15/2021 ( Status Report due by 1/15/2021); granting #52 Motion to Stay (lah, Chambers)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; terminating attorney Jordan E Jarreau and Melissa Dorman Matthews ; granting #51 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (lah, Chambers)
September 23, 2020 Filing 53 MAIL to Darren McDowell Returned - remailed on 9/23/20 to 5473 Blair Road Dallas TX 75231 - new address obtained from Fears Nachawati Law firm Website. (Re: 44 Minute Order,, Adding/Terminating Attorney(s),, Ruling on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,,, ) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
September 23, 2020 Filing 52 Joint MOTION to Stay (Joint Motion for Temporary Stay) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc (Griffith, Joseph)
September 23, 2020 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) (Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel Following Transfer) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc (Griffith, Joseph)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 10/13/2020) (lah, Chambers)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; finding as moot #25 Motion to Sever; finding as moot #2 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell terminating referral to Magistrate Judge [Doc. 2 and Doc. 25], terminating motion referral(s) (Re: #25 Supplemental MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases, #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
September 14, 2020 Filing 47 MAIL to Darren McDowell Returned - remailed on 9/14/20 to 5473 Blair Road Dallas TX 75231 - new address obtained from Fears Nachawati Law firm Website.. (Re: #27 Opinion and Order,,,,,,, #34 Letter re: Local Counsel Requirement, 29 Minute Order,,,, Directing Party(ies) to File Corporate Disclosure Statement,,, #31 Letter re: Local Counsel Requirement, 35 Minute Order, Changing Case Number ) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
September 11, 2020 Filing 46 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jonathan Bass on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc [Note: Attorney Jonathan Bass added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Bass added to party C R Bard Inc(pty:dft).] (Bass, Jonathan)
September 11, 2020 Filing 45 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joseph Griffith on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc [Note: Attorney Joseph Griffith added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Griffith added to party C R Bard Inc(pty:dft).] (Griffith, Joseph)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting Defendants' motions for admission pro hac vice [Docs. 42 and 43] ; adding attorney Jonathan B Bass,Joseph P Griffith for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated,Jonathan B Bass,Joseph P Griffith for C R Bard Inc ; granting #42 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #43 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 9, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph Griffith to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2263463) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc (With attachments) (Buchan, James)
September 9, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jonathan Bass to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2263456) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc (With attachments) (Buchan, James)
September 8, 2020 Filing 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation (Buchan, James)
September 8, 2020 Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for C R Bard Inc) by C R Bard Inc (Buchan, James)
September 8, 2020 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent C.R. Bard, Inc., Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated (Buchan, James)
September 4, 2020 Filing 38 STIPULATION of Dismissal, dismissing McKesson Corporation, by McKesson Corporation (Buchan, James)
September 4, 2020 Filing 37 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Craig Buchan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation [Note: Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party C R Bard Inc(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft).] (Buchan, James)
September 4, 2020 Filing 36 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Micah John Petersen on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation [Note: Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party C R Bard Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft).] (Petersen, Micah)
September 1, 2020 Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , changing case number to 20-cv-443-GKF-FHM (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
September 1, 2020 Filing 34 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Jordan E Jarreau (jjs, Dpty Clk)
September 1, 2020 Filing 33 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Melissa Dorman Matthews (jjs, Dpty Clk)
September 1, 2020 Filing 32 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Steven Scott Schulte (jjs, Dpty Clk)
September 1, 2020 Filing 31 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Darren McDowell (jjs, Dpty Clk)
September 1, 2020 Filing 30 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Eric Martin Przybysz (jjs, Dpty Clk)
September 1, 2020 Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., McKesson to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
September 1, 2020 Filing 28 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Texas Northern
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Memorandum Opinion and Order Grants #19 Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Melina Bailey's case be severed and transferred to the Lexington Division of the Eastern District of Kentucky (3:20-cv-2644 case opened); b. Plaintiff Michael Gonzalez's case be severed and transferred to the Tampa Division of the Middle District of Florida (3:20-cv-2645 case opened); c. Plaintiff Tierney Langley's case be severed and transferred to the Northern Division of the District of Maryland (3:20-cv-2646 case opened); d. Plaintiff David Laughter's case be severed and transferred to the Spartanburg Division of the District of South Carolina (3:20-cv-2647 case opened); e. Plaintiff Mickey McAdams's case be severed and transferred to the Augusta Division of the Southern District of Georgia (3:20-cv-2648 case opened); f. Plaintiff Tangle Shealey's case be severed and transferred to the Northern Division of the Middle District of Alabama (3:20-cv-2649 case opened); g. Plaintiff Patricia Summers's case be severed and transferred to the Cleveland Division of the Northern District of Ohio (3:20-cv-2650 case opened); and h. Plaintiff Gwendolyn Thomas's case be severed and transferred to the Northern District of Oklahoma (3:20-cv-2651 case opened). Plaintiff Lesley Enriquez is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, he shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/31/2020) (mjr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc re: #25 Supplemental MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases, #19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 25 Supplemental MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Mickey McAdams (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' agreement, see ECF Nos. #19 , #23 , the Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff Beth Statman's claims against Defendants. The parties shall bear their own costs. All relief not expressly granted is DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/26/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 23 Supplemental RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc re: #19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Matthews, Melissa) Modified title on 8/25/2020 (awc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc re: #19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Melina Bailey, Michael Gonzalez, Tierney Langley, David Laughter, Mickey McAdams, Tangle Shealey, Beth Statman, Patricia Summers, Gwendolyn Thomas re #19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Melina Bailey, Michael Gonzalez, Tierney Langley, David Laughter, Mickey McAdams, Tangle Shealey, Beth Statman, Patricia Summers, Gwendolyn Thomas re #19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs, MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division () filed by Melina Bailey, Michael Gonzalez, Tierney Langley, David Laughter, Mickey McAdams, Tangle Shealey, Beth Statman, Patricia Summers, Gwendolyn Thomas (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Melina Bailey, Lesley Enriquez, Michael Gonzalez, Tierney Langley, David Laughter, Mickey McAdams, Tangle Shealey, Beth Statman, Patricia Summers, Gwendolyn Thomas re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Melina Bailey, Lesley Enriquez, Michael Gonzalez, Tierney Langley, David Laughter, Mickey McAdams, Tangle Shealey, Beth Statman, Patricia Summers, Gwendolyn Thomas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #15 Order, filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before 7/22/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (oyh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Melina Bailey, Lesley Enriquez, Michael Gonzalez, Tierney Langley, David Laughter, Mickey McAdams, Tangle Shealey, Beth Statman, Patricia Summers, Gwendolyn Thomas (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Judge David C Godbey no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/17/2020) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10908922) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson page, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Docs, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 2020-04-07 Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 2020-04-07 Civil Case Info. Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 2020-04-08 Citation Issued - C.R. Bard, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 2020-04-08 Citation Issued - Bard, #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 2020-04-08 Citation Issued - McKesson, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 2020-05-06 Return of Service - McKesson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 2020-05-22 Return of Service - C.R. Bard, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 2020-06-04 Return of Service - Bard) (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2020.]
April 7, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Gwendolyn Thomas (jjs, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Joseph P Griffith
Represented By: Joseph Griffith
Represented By: Jonathan Bass
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Represented By: Jonathan B Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Joseph P Griffith
Represented By: Joseph Griffith
Represented By: Jonathan Bass
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Represented By: Jonathan B Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Thomas
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?