Yates v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Green Yates
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00478
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
2 Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , Parties are to take notice that documents are being filed in this matter which incorrectly cite the case number. The correct case number, 20-CV-0478-CVE-CDL, should be noted and corrected on all future pleadings. (Re: #20 Joint Status Report per Local Rule 16.1, 19 Minute Order,, Reassigning Case,, Changing Case Number, ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
November 18, 2020 Filing 20 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (With attachments) (Griffith, Joseph)
November 7, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk reassigning the magistrate judge in this case pursuant to General Order 20-37, reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Christine D Little, Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 20-cv-478-CVE-CDL (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (a-hc, Dpty Clk)
October 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: the pdf did not include Judge's signature; Correction: Attached pdf with Judge's signature (Re: #11 Order,,, Ruling on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,,,,, ) (crp, Dpty Clk)
October 21, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent C.R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.) by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Griffith, Joseph)
October 21, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for C.R. Bard, Inc.) by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Griffith, Joseph)
October 21, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jonathan Bass on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. [Note: Attorney Jonathan Bass added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Bass added to party C.R. Bard, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Bass, Jonathan)
October 21, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joseph Griffith on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. [Note: Attorney Joseph Griffith added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Griffith added to party C.R. Bard, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Griffith, Joseph)
October 21, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing C.R. Bard, Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: Pdf was entered simultaneous to the entry of the reassignment minute order changing the magistrate judge; Correction: Attached pdf with corrected case number since reassignment of magistrate judge (Re: #11 Order,, Ruling on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,,, ) (crp, Dpty Clk)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that Jonathan Bass and Joseph Griffith are admitted pro hac vice for the limited purpose of representing defendants in this matter. Counsel are directed to file a separate entry of appearance forthwith. ; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (RGG, Chambers) Modified on 10/20/2020 to replace pdf with corrected pdf (case number) (crp, Dpty Clk). Modified on 10/21/2020 to replace pdf with signed pdf (crp, Dpty Clk).
October 20, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER Court Clerk, changing case number to 20-cv-478-CVE-FHM, recusing Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne. Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy reassigned to case. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sdc, Dpty Clk)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph Griffith to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2288033) by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (With attachments) (Buchan, James)
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jonathan Bass to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2288026) by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (With attachments) (Buchan, James)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 11/18/2020) (RGG, Chambers)
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Buchan, James)
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Micah John Petersen on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. [Note: Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party C.R. Bard, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Petersen, Micah)
October 19, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Craig Buchan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. [Note: Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party C.R. Bard, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Buchan, James)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (dlg, Dpty Clk)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Kimberly Green Yates (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2273489) by Kimberly Green Yates (Robertson, Jason)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kimberly Green Yates (Robertson, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yates v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Represented By: Jonathan Bass
Represented By: Joseph Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Represented By: Jonathan Bass
Represented By: Joseph Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Green Yates
Represented By: Jason Allen Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?