Progressive Direct Insurance Company v. Hudgins et al
Plaintiff: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Defendant: Chad Hudgins, Angela McNeill, Victoria Rylant, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co., Jonathan Cullum, Katlyn McNeill, Katelynn Conner, Sandra Patton, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. and Brianna Smith
Case Number: 4:2020cv00497
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
2 Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 12/21/2020) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 20, 2020 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. (Taylor, Robert)
November 13, 2020 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 12, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Angela McNeill, Katlyn McNeill, Sandra Patton (Ward, Jeremy)
November 12, 2020 Filing 23 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jennifer Ary Brown on behalf of Angela McNeill, Katlyn McNeill, Sandra Patton [Note: Attorney Jennifer Ary Brown added to party Angela McNeill(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Ary Brown added to party Katlyn McNeill(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Ary Brown added to party Sandra Patton(pty:dft).] (Brown, Jennifer)
November 12, 2020 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeremy Kalon Ward on behalf of Angela McNeill, Katlyn McNeill, Sandra Patton [Note: Attorney Jeremy Kalon Ward added to party Angela McNeill(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy Kalon Ward added to party Katlyn McNeill(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy Kalon Ward added to party Sandra Patton(pty:dft).] (Ward, Jeremy)
November 11, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. (Taylor, Robert)
November 11, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Katelynn Conner (Taylor, Robert)
November 11, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert Howard Taylor on behalf of Katelynn Conner, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. [Note: Attorney Robert Howard Taylor added to party Katelynn Conner(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Howard Taylor added to party Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Taylor, Robert)
November 7, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk reassigning the magistrate judge in this case pursuant to General Order 20-37, reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Christine D Little, Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 20-cv-497-GKF-CDL (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (a-hc, Dpty Clk)
October 28, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Sandra Patton (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Roberson, Brad)
October 28, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Chad Hudgins (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Roberson, Brad)
October 28, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Katelynn Conner (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Roberson, Brad)
October 26, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Roberson, Brad)
October 26, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Roberson, Brad)
October 26, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Katlyn McNeill (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Roberson, Brad)
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Victoria Rylant (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Roberson, Brad)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Angela McNeill , as Mother and Next Friend of M.M., a Minor (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Roberson, Brad)
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Angela McNeill , Individually (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Roberson, Brad)
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Progressive Direct Insurance Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Direct Insurance Company) by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Roberson, Brad)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rhiannon Kay Baker on behalf of Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Baker, Rhiannon)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Dawn Michelle Goeres on behalf of Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Goeres, Dawn)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brad Roberson on behalf of Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Roberson, Brad)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Katelynn Conner, Jonathan Cullum, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Chad Hudgins, Angela McNeill, Katlyn McNeill, Sandra Patton, Victoria Rylant, Brianna Smith, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2278399) by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (With attachments) (Roberson, Brad)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Roberson, Brad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive Direct Insurance Company v. Hudgins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela McNeill
Represented By: Jeremy Kalon Ward
Represented By: Jennifer Ary Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Rylant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Cullum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katlyn McNeill
Represented By: Jeremy Kalon Ward
Represented By: Jennifer Ary Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katelynn Conner
Represented By: Robert Howard Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Patton
Represented By: Jeremy Kalon Ward
Represented By: Jennifer Ary Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Howard Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brianna Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Dawn Michelle Goeres
Represented By: Rhiannon Kay Baker
Represented By: Brad Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?