T.D. Williamson, Inc. v. Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: T.D. Williamson, Inc.
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00571
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 1/6/2021) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 14, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Federal Insurance Company (Stiner, John)
December 2, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bryan P Vezey on behalf of Federal Insurance Company (Vezey, Bryan)
December 1, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joseph A Ziemianski on behalf of Federal Insurance Company (Ziemianski, Joseph)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting motions for admission pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant Federal Insurance Company [Docs. 10 and 12] and ; adding attorney Joseph A Ziemianski,Bryan P Vezey for Federal Insurance Company ; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 25, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Federal Insurance Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
November 24, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bryan P. Vezey to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2307814) by Federal Insurance Company (With attachments) (Stiner, John)
November 23, 2020 Filing 11 ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph A. Ziemianski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2307276) ) by Federal Insurance Company (With attachments) (Stiner, John)
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph A. Ziemianski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2307276) by Federal Insurance Company (With attachments) (Stiner, John)
November 23, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc for Federal Insurance Company) by Federal Insurance Company (Stiner, John)
November 23, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Douglas Stiner on behalf of Federal Insurance Company [Note: Attorney John Douglas Stiner added to party Federal Insurance Company(pty:dft).] (Stiner, John)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stephen T. Raptis ; adding attorney Stephen T Raptis for T.D. Williamson, Inc. ; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephen T. Raptis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2304467) by T.D. Williamson, Inc. (With attachments) (Woods, Christopher)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by T.D. Williamson, Inc. (Woods, Christopher)
November 9, 2020 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing T.D. Williamson, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to provide a three-ring binder notebook for use by the Court containing a paper copy of the document, with tabbed exhibits, as filed at Doc. 2. Said paper copy shall be a complete and exact duplicate of the filing after it was filed with the Court, including the case and docket number information at the top of each page. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher Benton Woods on behalf of T.D. Williamson, Inc. (Woods, Christopher)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against T.D. Williamson, Inc. (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2297106) by T.D. Williamson, Inc. (With attachments) (Woods, Christopher)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by T.D. Williamson, Inc. (Woods, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T.D. Williamson, Inc. v. Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan P Vezey
Represented By: John Douglas Stiner
Represented By: Joseph A Ziemianski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.D. Williamson, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Benton Woods
Represented By: Stephen T Raptis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?