Lackey v. Paypal Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: John David Lackey
Defendant: Paypal Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00574
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk re: remand (sac, Dpty Clk)
December 2, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #18 ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge John F Heil, III ; remanding case (terminates case) ; granting #11 Motion to Remand (Documents Terminated: #11 MOTION to Remand , #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) (pll, Dpty Clk)
November 30, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #11 MOTION to Remand ) by John David Lackey ; (With attachments) (Lackey, John)
November 25, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion PayPal's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Re: #11 MOTION to Remand ) by Paypal Holdings, Inc. ; (With attachments) (McVicker, Jason)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Judge John F Heil, III : Granting plaintiff's motion to stay response time. Plaintiff's response to the motion to compel arbitration will be due 14 days following the Court's ruling on the motion to remand ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); granting #14 Motion to Stay (Re: #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, #11 MOTION to Remand ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
November 17, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay Pending Motion to Remand (Emergency) by John David Lackey (With attachments) (Lackey, John)
November 16, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason Alan McVicker on behalf of Paypal Holdings, Inc. [Note: Attorney Jason Alan McVicker added to party Paypal Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft).] (McVicker, Jason)
November 10, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Michael R Annis (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 10, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Motion to Compel); Correction: changed event (Motion to Compel Arbitration) (Re: #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
November 9, 2020 ***Motion Referral(s) terminated (Re: #8 MOTION to Compel (filed in State Court) ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
November 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by John David Lackey (With attachments) (Lackey, John)
November 9, 2020 Filing 10 ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Paypal Holdings, Inc. (Annis, Michael)
November 9, 2020 Filing 9 ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Paypal Holdings, Inc. (Annis, Michael)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Paypal Holdings, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Francis H. LoCoco (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Paypal Holdings, Inc. (With attachments) (Annis, Michael)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Paypal Holdings, Inc. (Annis, Michael)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael R Annis on behalf of Paypal Holdings, Inc. (Annis, Michael)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Paypal Holdings, Inc. (Annis, Michael)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2020-03036 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2299071) by Paypal Holdings, Inc. (With attachments) (Annis, Michael)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Paypal Holdings, Inc. (Annis, Michael)
November 5, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (filed in State Court) by Paypal Holdings, Inc. (sc, Dpty Clk) Modified on 11/10/2020 edit docket text (sc, Dpty Clk). Modified on 11/10/2020 to change event (sac, Dpty Clk).
October 7, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Paypal Holdings, Inc. by John David Lackey (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lackey v. Paypal Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John David Lackey
Represented By: John David Lackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paypal Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R Annis
Represented By: Jason Alan McVicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?