Cherokee Nation, The et al v. Bunch et al
Plaintiff: Cherokee Nation, The and Cherokee Nation Businesses, LLC
Defendant: Joe Bunch, Eddie Sacks, Jeannie Tidwell, Frankie Still, Berry Dotson, John Adair, Jane Doe, John Doe, Adam Proctor, Jeff Wacoche, Charles Smoke, Jamie Thompson, Joyce Fourkiller, Adalene Smith, Sharon Benoit, Eldine Stevens, Peggy Girty and Ella Mae Worley
Case Number: 4:2020cv00596
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
2 Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 25 U.S.C. ยง 640
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #15 ) (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 28, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Dismissal, closing case, by Cherokee Nation Businesses, LLC, Cherokee Nation, The (Nimmo, Chrissi)
December 21, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Laura Bauman on behalf of John Adair, Sharon Benoit, Joe Bunch, Berry Dotson, Joyce Fourkiller, Peggy Girty, Adam Proctor, Eddie Sacks, Adalene Smith, Charles Smoke, Eldine Stevens, Frankie Still, Jamie Thompson, Jeannie Tidwell, Jeff Wacoche, Ella Mae Worley [Note: Attorney Laura Bauman added to party John Adair(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Bauman added to party Sharon Benoit(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Bauman added to party Joe Bunch(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Bauman added to party Berry Dotson(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Bauman added to party Joyce Fourkiller(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Bauman added to party Peggy Girty(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Bauman added to party Adam Proctor(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Bauman added to party Eddie Sacks(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Bauman added to party Adalene Smith(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Bauman added to party Charles Smoke(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Bauman added to party Eldine Stevens(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Bauman added to party Frankie Still(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Bauman added to party Jamie Thompson(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Bauman added to party Jeannie Tidwell(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Bauman added to party Jeff Wacoche(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Bauman added to party Ella Mae Worley(pty:dft).] (Bauman, Laura)
December 21, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Pamela G Levinson on behalf of John Adair, Sharon Benoit, Joe Bunch, Berry Dotson, Joyce Fourkiller, Peggy Girty, Adam Proctor, Eddie Sacks, Adalene Smith, Charles Smoke, Eldine Stevens, Frankie Still, Jamie Thompson, Jeannie Tidwell, Jeff Wacoche, Ella Mae Worley [Note: Attorney Pamela G Levinson added to party John Adair(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G Levinson added to party Sharon Benoit(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G Levinson added to party Joe Bunch(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G Levinson added to party Berry Dotson(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G Levinson added to party Joyce Fourkiller(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G Levinson added to party Peggy Girty(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G Levinson added to party Adam Proctor(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G Levinson added to party Eddie Sacks(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G Levinson added to party Adalene Smith(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G Levinson added to party Charles Smoke(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G Levinson added to party Eldine Stevens(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G Levinson added to party Frankie Still(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G Levinson added to party Jamie Thompson(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G Levinson added to party Jeannie Tidwell(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G Levinson added to party Jeff Wacoche(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G Levinson added to party Ella Mae Worley(pty:dft).] (Levinson, Pamela)
December 21, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Charles Nelson on behalf of John Adair, Sharon Benoit, Joe Bunch, Berry Dotson, Joyce Fourkiller, Peggy Girty, Adam Proctor, Eddie Sacks, Adalene Smith, Charles Smoke, Eldine Stevens, Frankie Still, Jamie Thompson, Jeannie Tidwell, Jeff Wacoche, Ella Mae Worley [Note: Attorney Jeffrey Charles Nelson added to party John Adair(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Charles Nelson added to party Sharon Benoit(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Charles Nelson added to party Joe Bunch(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Charles Nelson added to party Berry Dotson(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Charles Nelson added to party Joyce Fourkiller(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Charles Nelson added to party Peggy Girty(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Charles Nelson added to party Adam Proctor(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Charles Nelson added to party Eddie Sacks(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Charles Nelson added to party Adalene Smith(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Charles Nelson added to party Charles Smoke(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Charles Nelson added to party Eldine Stevens(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Charles Nelson added to party Frankie Still(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Charles Nelson added to party Jamie Thompson(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Charles Nelson added to party Jeannie Tidwell(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Charles Nelson added to party Jeff Wacoche(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Charles Nelson added to party Ella Mae Worley(pty:dft).] (Nelson, Jeffrey)
December 14, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Altom M Maglio on behalf of John Adair, Sharon Benoit, Joe Bunch, Berry Dotson, Joyce Fourkiller, Peggy Girty, Adam Proctor, Eddie Sacks, Adalene Smith, Charles Smoke, Eldine Stevens, Frankie Still, Jamie Thompson, Jeannie Tidwell, Jeff Wacoche, Ella Mae Worley [Note: Attorney Altom M Maglio added to party John Adair(pty:dft), Attorney Altom M Maglio added to party Sharon Benoit(pty:dft), Attorney Altom M Maglio added to party Joe Bunch(pty:dft), Attorney Altom M Maglio added to party Berry Dotson(pty:dft), Attorney Altom M Maglio added to party Joyce Fourkiller(pty:dft), Attorney Altom M Maglio added to party Peggy Girty(pty:dft), Attorney Altom M Maglio added to party Adam Proctor(pty:dft), Attorney Altom M Maglio added to party Eddie Sacks(pty:dft), Attorney Altom M Maglio added to party Adalene Smith(pty:dft), Attorney Altom M Maglio added to party Charles Smoke(pty:dft), Attorney Altom M Maglio added to party Eldine Stevens(pty:dft), Attorney Altom M Maglio added to party Frankie Still(pty:dft), Attorney Altom M Maglio added to party Jamie Thompson(pty:dft), Attorney Altom M Maglio added to party Jeannie Tidwell(pty:dft), Attorney Altom M Maglio added to party Jeff Wacoche(pty:dft), Attorney Altom M Maglio added to party Ella Mae Worley(pty:dft).] (Maglio, Altom)
December 13, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Klint Austin Cowan on behalf of John Adair, Sharon Benoit, Joe Bunch, Berry Dotson, Joyce Fourkiller, Peggy Girty, Adam Proctor, Eddie Sacks, Adalene Smith, Charles Smoke, Eldine Stevens, Frankie Still, Jamie Thompson, Jeannie Tidwell, Jeff Wacoche, Ella Mae Worley [Note: Attorney Klint Austin Cowan added to party John Adair(pty:dft), Attorney Klint Austin Cowan added to party Sharon Benoit(pty:dft), Attorney Klint Austin Cowan added to party Joe Bunch(pty:dft), Attorney Klint Austin Cowan added to party Berry Dotson(pty:dft), Attorney Klint Austin Cowan added to party Joyce Fourkiller(pty:dft), Attorney Klint Austin Cowan added to party Peggy Girty(pty:dft), Attorney Klint Austin Cowan added to party Adam Proctor(pty:dft), Attorney Klint Austin Cowan added to party Eddie Sacks(pty:dft), Attorney Klint Austin Cowan added to party Adalene Smith(pty:dft), Attorney Klint Austin Cowan added to party Charles Smoke(pty:dft), Attorney Klint Austin Cowan added to party Eldine Stevens(pty:dft), Attorney Klint Austin Cowan added to party Frankie Still(pty:dft), Attorney Klint Austin Cowan added to party Jamie Thompson(pty:dft), Attorney Klint Austin Cowan added to party Jeannie Tidwell(pty:dft), Attorney Klint Austin Cowan added to party Jeff Wacoche(pty:dft), Attorney Klint Austin Cowan added to party Ella Mae Worley(pty:dft).] (Cowan, Klint)
December 9, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: John Adair, Sharon Benoit, Joe Bunch, Jane Doe, John Doe, Berry Dotson, Joyce Fourkiller, Peggy Girty, Adam Proctor, Eddie Sacks, Adalene Smith, Charles Smoke, Eldine Stevens, Frankie Still, Jamie Thompson, Jeannie Tidwell, Jeff Wacoche, Ella Mae Worley (Re: #1 Complaint, ) by Cherokee Nation, The, Cherokee Nation Businesses, LLC (Nimmo, Chrissi)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting Motion for Admission of Attorneys Pro Hac Vice [Doc. 7] and ; adding attorney Donald J Simon,K Amanda Saunders for Cherokee Nation Businesses, LLC,Donald J Simon,K Amanda Saunders for Cherokee Nation, The ; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Donald J. Simon and K. Amanda Saunders to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2312322) by Cherokee Nation Businesses, LLC, Cherokee Nation, The (With attachments) (Nimmo, Chrissi)
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk reassigning case to Judge Gregory K Frizzell as it is related to 12-cv-00493-GKF-JFJ, reassigning case to Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Chief Judge John E Dowdell no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 20-cv-596-GKF-CDL (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell Plaintiffs' Motion to Reassign Case to Judge Frizzell (Doc. 3) is granted. The Court Clerk is directed to correct the docket to reflect the new judge assignment. ; granting #3 Motion to Reassign Judge (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Reassign Judge by Cherokee Nation Businesses, LLC, Cherokee Nation, The (Holleman, Frank)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Cherokee Nation Businesses, LLC, Cherokee Nation, The (Holleman, Frank)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2306552) by Cherokee Nation, The, Cherokee Nation Businesses, LLC [Note: Attorney Frank Sharp Holleman, IV added to party Cherokee Nation Businesses, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Frank Sharp Holleman, IV added to party Cherokee Nation, The(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Holleman, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cherokee Nation, The et al v. Bunch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Bunch
Represented By: Pamela G Levinson
Represented By: Laura Bauman
Represented By: Altom M Maglio
Represented By: Klint Austin Cowan
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Sacks
Represented By: Pamela G Levinson
Represented By: Laura Bauman
Represented By: Altom M Maglio
Represented By: Klint Austin Cowan
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannie Tidwell
Represented By: Pamela G Levinson
Represented By: Laura Bauman
Represented By: Altom M Maglio
Represented By: Klint Austin Cowan
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frankie Still
Represented By: Pamela G Levinson
Represented By: Laura Bauman
Represented By: Altom M Maglio
Represented By: Klint Austin Cowan
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berry Dotson
Represented By: Pamela G Levinson
Represented By: Laura Bauman
Represented By: Altom M Maglio
Represented By: Klint Austin Cowan
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Adair
Represented By: Pamela G Levinson
Represented By: Laura Bauman
Represented By: Altom M Maglio
Represented By: Klint Austin Cowan
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Proctor
Represented By: Pamela G Levinson
Represented By: Laura Bauman
Represented By: Altom M Maglio
Represented By: Klint Austin Cowan
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Wacoche
Represented By: Pamela G Levinson
Represented By: Laura Bauman
Represented By: Altom M Maglio
Represented By: Klint Austin Cowan
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Smoke
Represented By: Pamela G Levinson
Represented By: Laura Bauman
Represented By: Altom M Maglio
Represented By: Klint Austin Cowan
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Thompson
Represented By: Pamela G Levinson
Represented By: Laura Bauman
Represented By: Altom M Maglio
Represented By: Klint Austin Cowan
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Fourkiller
Represented By: Pamela G Levinson
Represented By: Laura Bauman
Represented By: Altom M Maglio
Represented By: Klint Austin Cowan
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adalene Smith
Represented By: Pamela G Levinson
Represented By: Laura Bauman
Represented By: Altom M Maglio
Represented By: Klint Austin Cowan
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Benoit
Represented By: Pamela G Levinson
Represented By: Laura Bauman
Represented By: Altom M Maglio
Represented By: Klint Austin Cowan
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldine Stevens
Represented By: Pamela G Levinson
Represented By: Laura Bauman
Represented By: Altom M Maglio
Represented By: Klint Austin Cowan
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Girty
Represented By: Pamela G Levinson
Represented By: Laura Bauman
Represented By: Altom M Maglio
Represented By: Klint Austin Cowan
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ella Mae Worley
Represented By: Pamela G Levinson
Represented By: Laura Bauman
Represented By: Altom M Maglio
Represented By: Klint Austin Cowan
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherokee Nation, The
Represented By: Frank Sharp Holleman, IV
Represented By: Leslie Mariah Thompson
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Hill
Represented By: Chrissi R Nimmo
Represented By: K Amanda Saunders
Represented By: Lloyd B Miller
Represented By: Donald J Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherokee Nation Businesses, LLC
Represented By: Frank Sharp Holleman, IV
Represented By: Leslie Mariah Thompson
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Hill
Represented By: Chrissi R Nimmo
Represented By: K Amanda Saunders
Represented By: Donald J Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?