Cross v. DXC Technology Services
Plaintiff: Casey Edward Cross
Defendant: DXC Technology Services and DXC Technology Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00599
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting Motion for Permission to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Doc. 14] and ; adding attorney Sonni Fort Nolan for DXC Technology Services, LLC ; granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
January 20, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sonni Fort Nolan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2340453) by DXC Technology Services, LLC (With attachments) (Warman, Mark)
January 12, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Remand (Re: #11 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support ) by DXC Technology Services, LLC ; (With attachments) (Pearlstone, Katherine)
December 28, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: this is a discovery document; Correction: notified filer that pursuant to FRCvP Rule 5(d)(1) and Local Civil Rule 26.3, discovery material is not to be filed (Re: #12 Notice of Deposition ) (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Deposition by DXC Technology Services, LLC (Pearlstone, Katherine) Modified on 12/28/2020: Notified filer that pursuant to FRCvP Rule 5(d)(1) and Local Civil Rule 26.3, discovery material is not to be filed (sc, Dpty Clk).
December 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support by Casey Edward Cross (Frasier, Frank)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 8/6/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 8/20/2021, Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/29/2021, Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Jury Trial set for 12/20/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 17, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Casey Edward Cross (Frasier, Frank)
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by DXC Technology Services, LLC (Warman, Mark)
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent DXC Technology Company for DXC Technology Services, LLC) by DXC Technology Services, LLC (Warman, Mark)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by DXC Technology Services, LLC (Warman, Mark)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing DXC Technology Services, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk) Modified on 11/24/2020 to correct party name (sc, Dpty Clk).
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 12/17/2020) (lah, Chambers)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County, case number CJ-2020-3225 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2307273) by DXC Technology Services, LLC (With attachments) (Warman, Mark) Modified on 11/24/2020 to correct party name(sc, Dpty Clk).
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by DXC Technology Services, LLC (Warman, Mark) Modified on 11/24/2020 to correct party name (sc, Dpty Clk).
October 22, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against DXC Technology Services by Casey Edward Cross (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cross v. DXC Technology Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DXC Technology Services
Represented By: Mark Alan Warman
Represented By: Katherine T Pearlstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DXC Technology Services, LLC
Represented By: Mark Alan Warman
Represented By: Katherine T Pearlstone
Represented By: Sonni Fort Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Edward Cross
Represented By: Maureen McDonough Johnson
Represented By: Frank W Frasier, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?