Beissel et al v. Western Flyer Express, LLC
Plaintiff: J&B Enterprises, Inc. and Andrew Beissel
Defendant: Western Flyer Express, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00638
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Diamond T Holding, LLC for Western Flyer Express, LLC) by Western Flyer Express, LLC (Smith, Michael)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David Christopher Leimbach on behalf of Andrew Beissel [Note: Attorney David Christopher Leimbach added to party Andrew Beissel(pty:pla).] (Leimbach, David)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Carolyn H Cottrell on behalf of Andrew Beissel [Note: Attorney Carolyn H Cottrell added to party Andrew Beissel(pty:pla).] (Cottrell, Carolyn)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Carolyn H. Cottrell (Doc. 17), David C. Leimbach (Doc. 18) and Travis H. A. Smith (Doc. 19) are granted. Counsel may appear in this matter on behalf of the Plaintiffs. ; granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Travis H. A. Smith to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2341631) by Andrew Beissel (With attachments) (Mor, Rachel)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) David C. Leimbach to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2341622) by Andrew Beissel (With attachments) (Mor, Rachel)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Carolyn H. Cottrell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2341619) by Andrew Beissel (With attachments) (Mor, Rachel)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell Defendant Western Flyer Express, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Other Responsive Pleading (Doc. 13) is granted. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading shall be filed by February 8, 2021. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 2/8/2021); granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Western Flyer Express, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
January 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Timothy Lawrence Spencer on behalf of Western Flyer Express, LLC [Note: Attorney Timothy Lawrence Spencer added to party Western Flyer Express, LLC(pty:dft).] (Spencer, Timothy)
January 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Other Responsive Pleading (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Western Flyer Express, LLC (Smith, Michael)
January 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Franklin Smith on behalf of Western Flyer Express, LLC [Note: Attorney Michael Franklin Smith added to party Western Flyer Express, LLC(pty:dft).] (Smith, Michael)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Western Flyer Express, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by J&B Enterprises, Inc., Andrew Beissel (Mor, Rachel)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Western Flyer Express, LLC (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert S Boulter on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Robert S Boulter added to party Andrew Beissel(pty:pla), Attorney Robert S Boulter added to party J&B Enterprises, Inc.(pty:pla).] (Boulter, Robert)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert S. Boulter (Doc. 7) is granted. Counsel may appear in this matter on behalf of the Plaintiffs. ; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert S. Boulter to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2316584) by Andrew Beissel, J&B Enterprises, Inc. (With attachments) (Mor, Rachel)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by J&B Enterprises, Inc. (Mor, Rachel)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing J&B Enterprises, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael J Blaschke on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Michael J Blaschke added to party Andrew Beissel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael J Blaschke added to party J&B Enterprises, Inc.(pty:pla).] (Blaschke, Michael)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rachel Lawrence Mor on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mor, Rachel)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Plaintiffs (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2314356) by J&B Enterprises, Inc., Andrew Beissel (Mor, Rachel)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Andrew Beissel, J&B Enterprises, Inc. (Mor, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beissel et al v. Western Flyer Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&B Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J Blaschke
Represented By: Rachel Lawrence Mor
Represented By: Robert S Boulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Beissel
Represented By: Michael J Blaschke
Represented By: Rachel Lawrence Mor
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Represented By: Carolyn H Cottrell
Represented By: Robert S Boulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Flyer Express, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Lawrence Spencer
Represented By: Michael Franklin Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?