Hoggatt v. Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kristen Hoggatt
Defendant: Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00647
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
January 20, 2021 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Experian Information Solutions, Inc. for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Goodman, Jimmy)
January 20, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Goodman, Jimmy)
January 20, 2021 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jimmy K Goodman on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. [Note: Attorney Jimmy K Goodman added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Goodman, Jimmy)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell Defendant Trans Union LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 16) is granted. Trans Union's answer or other responsive pleading shall be filed on February 10, 2021. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 2/10/2021); granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 12) is granted. Equifax's answer or other responsive pleading shall be filed on February 19, 2021. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 2/19/2021); granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
January 19, 2021 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, and Trans Union, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
January 19, 2021 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jill J'Ann Walker-Abdoveis on behalf of Trans Union, LLC [Note: Attorney Jill J'Ann Walker-Abdoveis added to party Trans Union, LLC(pty:dft).] (Walker-Abdoveis, Jill)
January 18, 2021 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC) by Trans Union, LLC (Goodnight, Jason)
January 18, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Trans Union, LLC [Note: Attorney Jason Goodnight added to party Trans Union, LLC(pty:dft).] (Goodnight, Jason)
January 18, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc. (Stiner, John)
January 18, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC, Corporate Parent Nelnet Inc. for Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc.) by Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc. (Stiner, John)
January 18, 2021 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Douglas Stiner on behalf of Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc. [Note: Attorney John Douglas Stiner added to party Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Stiner, John)
January 15, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Equifax Information Services, LLC (With attachments) (Skinner, Maris)
January 15, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC) by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Skinner, Maris)
January 15, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Maris Amanda Rae Skinner on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC [Note: Attorney Maris Amanda Rae Skinner added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft).] (Skinner, Maris)
January 15, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Trans Union, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Kristen Hoggatt (Derry, Jason)
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Kristen Hoggatt (Derry, Jason)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Equifax Information Services, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Kristen Hoggatt (Derry, Jason)
January 15, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Kristen Hoggatt [Note: Attorney Jason R Derry added to party Kristen Hoggatt(pty:pla).] (Derry, Jason)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell Plaintiff's Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jason R. Derry (Doc. 3) is granted. ; granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jason R. Derry to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2317407) by Kristen Hoggatt (With attachments) (Brown, Ronald)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2317401) by Kristen Hoggatt (Brown, Ronald)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kristen Hoggatt (Brown, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoggatt v. Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc.
Represented By: John Douglas Stiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Maris Amanda Rae Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Jill J'Ann Walker-Abdoveis
Represented By: Jason Goodnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jimmy K Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Hoggatt
Represented By: Ronald D Brown
Represented By: Jason R Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?