Wheeler v. Medical Device Business Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daryl Wheeler
Defendant: DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Depuy Products, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 4:2020cv00666
Filed: December 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 ***Remark: : Case transferred from Oklahoma Northern has been opened in Northern District of Texas as case 3:21-cv-00181, filed 01/27/2021 (sac, Dpty Clk)
January 22, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #24 ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the MDL Panel, transferring case (terminates case) (ll, Dpty Clk)
January 22, 2021 Filing 23 ***Remark: Received Minute Order from MDL re: transferee clerk to transmit a certified copy of the Panel Order to transfer to the district court from which the action is being transferred. (ll, Dpty Clk)
January 22, 2021 Filing 22 ***Remark: Received Conditional Transfer Order from MDL re: stay is lifted (ll, Dpty Clk)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Johnson & Johnson, Inc. be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #18 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (ll, Dpty Clk)
January 15, 2021 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #19 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk)
January 15, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy)
January 15, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Johnson & Johnson, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy)
January 15, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Daryl Wheeler (Smolen, Donald)
January 14, 2021 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson & Johnson, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy)
January 14, 2021 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.) by Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy)
January 14, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson Medical Limited for DePuy International Limited) by DePuy International Limited (Sherry-Fischer, Amy)
January 14, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Codman & Shurtleff, Inc. for DePuy Products, Inc.) by DePuy Products, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy)
January 14, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson, Corporate Parent Synthes, Inc., Corporate Parent Medical Device Business Services, Inc. for DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.) by DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy)
January 12, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Products, Inc., DePuy International Limited, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., and Johnson & Johnson, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Defendants' answers or other responsive pleadings due 2/10/2021 ; granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint, ) (lah, Chambers)
January 11, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Products, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy)
January 11, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amy Sherry-Fischer on behalf of DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Products, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. [Note: Attorney Amy Sherry-Fischer added to party DePuy International Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Sherry-Fischer added to party DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Sherry-Fischer added to party DePuy Products, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Sherry-Fischer added to party Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Sherry-Fischer added to party Johnson & Johnson, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Sherry-Fischer, Amy)
December 31, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: DePuy Products, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Daryl Wheeler (Smolen, Donald)
December 31, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Daryl Wheeler (Smolen, Donald)
December 31, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Johnson & Johnson, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Daryl Wheeler (Smolen, Donald)
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Court Clerk of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge [includes the following attachments: (1) a Statement as to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form, and (2) a copy of General Order 16-08] (ll, Dpty Clk) Modified on 12/17/2020 - ENTERED IN ERROR - Filed to this case in error (ll, Dpty Clk).
December 17, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: document filed to this case in error; Correction: marked entry as entered in error; refiled in correct case (Re: #3 Clerk's Notice of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge (Social Security), ) (ll, Dpty Clk)
December 16, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Depuy Products, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2321611) by Daryl Wheeler (Smolen, Donald)
December 16, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Daryl Wheeler (Smolen, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. Medical Device Business Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy International Limited
Represented By: Amy Sherry-Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Products, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Sherry-Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Sherry-Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Device Business Services, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Sherry-Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Amy Sherry-Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl Wheeler
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?