Bruns v. Magellan Midstream Partners, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Vic Bruns
Defendant: Magellan Midstream Partners, L.P. and Magellan Ammonia Pipeline, L.P.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00080
Filed: February 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Susan E Huntsman
2 Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk reassigning the magistrate judge in this case pursuant to General Order 21-15, reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman, Magistrate Judge Christine D Little no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 21-cv-80-JFH-SH (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
April 13, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul Mario Catalano by on behalf of Vic Bruns (Catalano, Paul)
April 13, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lucius James Wallace by on behalf of Vic Bruns (Wallace, Lucius)
April 13, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert David Humphreys by on behalf of Vic Bruns (Humphreys, Robert)
April 7, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Brief ) by Magellan Ammonia Pipeline, L.P., Magellan Midstream Partners, L.P. ; (Fitzgerald, Craig)
April 1, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Barbara McHugh Moschovidis by on behalf of Magellan Ammonia Pipeline, L.P., Magellan Midstream Partners, L.P. (Moschovidis, Barbara)
March 23, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Brief ) by Vic Bruns ; (Humphreys, Robert)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Judge John F Heil, III : Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in entering a scheduling order in this case as there are pending dispositive motions which should first be resolved (Re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Brief ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
March 3, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Brief by Magellan Ammonia Pipeline, L.P., Magellan Midstream Partners, L.P. (Moschovidis, Barbara)
February 25, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Magellan Ammonia Pipeline, L.P., Magellan Midstream Partners, L.P. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
February 24, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Magellan Midstream Partners, L.P. (Fitzgerald, Craig)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Magellan Midstream Partners, L.P. for Magellan Ammonia Pipeline, L.P.) by Magellan Ammonia Pipeline, L.P. (Fitzgerald, Craig)
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeff Roderick on behalf of Magellan Ammonia Pipeline, L.P., Magellan Midstream Partners, L.P. (Roderick, Jeff)
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Barbara McHugh Moschovidis on behalf of Magellan Ammonia Pipeline, L.P., Magellan Midstream Partners, L.P. (Moschovidis, Barbara)
February 24, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amelia Ann Fogleman on behalf of Magellan Ammonia Pipeline, L.P., Magellan Midstream Partners, L.P. (Fogleman, Amelia)
February 24, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Craig Alan Fitzgerald on behalf of Magellan Ammonia Pipeline, L.P., Magellan Midstream Partners, L.P. (Fitzgerald, Craig)
February 24, 2021 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Magellan Ammonia Pipeline, L.P., Magellan Midstream Partners, L.P. (Fitzgerald, Craig)
February 24, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2021-216 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2361083) by Magellan Ammonia Pipeline, L.P., Magellan Midstream Partners, L.P. (Fitzgerald, Craig)
February 24, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Magellan Ammonia Pipeline, L.P., Magellan Midstream Partners, L.P. (Fitzgerald, Craig)
January 22, 2021 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Magellan Ammonia Pipeline, L.P., Magellan Midstream Partners, L.P. by Vic Bruns (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruns v. Magellan Midstream Partners, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vic Bruns
Represented By: Robert David Humphreys
Represented By: Lucius James Wallace
Represented By: Paul Mario Catalano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magellan Midstream Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Jeff Roderick
Represented By: Craig Alan Fitzgerald
Represented By: Amelia Ann Fogleman
Represented By: Barbara McHugh Moschovidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magellan Ammonia Pipeline, L.P.
Represented By: Jeff Roderick
Represented By: Craig Alan Fitzgerald
Represented By: Amelia Ann Fogleman
Represented By: Barbara McHugh Moschovidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?