North v. AHS Bailey Medical Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Trisha North
Defendant: AHS Bailey Medical Center, LLC, Steven Katsis and Surgical Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00082
Filed: February 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Susan E Huntsman
2 Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk reassigning the magistrate judge in this case pursuant to General Order 21-15, reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman, Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 21-cv-82-JFH-SH (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (srt, Dpty Clk)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Judge John F Heil, III : Following the filing of the amended complaint ; finding as moot #10 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Re: #14 Amended Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
April 14, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion and Notice that Motion to Dismiss is Moot (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) by Trisha North ; (Hamilton, Laura)
April 14, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AHS Bailey Medical Center, LLC, Steven Katsis, Surgical Associates, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Trisha North (With attachments) (Smolen, Donald)
March 31, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent AHS Hillcrest Healthcare System, LLC, Corporate Parent AHS Oklahoma, Inc., Corporate Parent AHS Legal Operations LLC for AHS Bailey Medical Center, LLC) by AHS Bailey Medical Center, LLC (Wolfram, Christina)
March 26, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Surgical Associates, Inc. (Best, Timothy)
March 25, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing AHS Bailey Medical Center, LLC and Surgical Associates, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
March 24, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by AHS Bailey Medical Center, LLC, Steven Katsis, Surgical Associates, Inc. (With attachments) (Best, Timothy)
March 24, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew Collier Mihelich on behalf of Steven Katsis, Surgical Associates, Inc. [Note: Attorney Andrew Collier Mihelich added to party Steven Katsis(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Collier Mihelich added to party Surgical Associates, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Mihelich, Andrew)
March 24, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sean Howard McKee on behalf of Steven Katsis, Surgical Associates, Inc. [Note: Attorney Sean Howard McKee added to party Steven Katsis(pty:dft), Attorney Sean Howard McKee added to party Surgical Associates, Inc.(pty:dft).] (McKee, Sean)
March 24, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Timothy Grover Best on behalf of Steven Katsis, Surgical Associates, Inc. [Note: Attorney Timothy Grover Best added to party Steven Katsis(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Grover Best added to party Surgical Associates, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Best, Timothy)
March 24, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brenna Nicole Wiebe on behalf of AHS Bailey Medical Center, LLC [Note: Attorney Brenna Nicole Wiebe added to party AHS Bailey Medical Center, LLC(pty:dft).] (Wiebe, Brenna)
March 24, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christina Marie Wolfram on behalf of AHS Bailey Medical Center, LLC [Note: Attorney Christina Marie Wolfram added to party AHS Bailey Medical Center, LLC(pty:dft).] (Wolfram, Christina)
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: AHS Bailey Medical Center, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Trisha North (Smolen, Donald)
February 25, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to AHS Bailey Medical Center, LLC, Steven Katsis, Surgical Associates, Inc. (ll, Dpty Clk)
February 24, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AHS Bailey Medical Center, LLC, Steven Katsis, Surgical Associates, Inc. (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2361204) by Trisha North (Smolen, Donald)
February 24, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Trisha North (Smolen, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North v. AHS Bailey Medical Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHS Bailey Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: Christina Marie Wolfram
Represented By: Brenna Nicole Wiebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Katsis
Represented By: Timothy Grover Best
Represented By: Sean Howard McKee
Represented By: Andrew Collier Mihelich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surgical Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Grover Best
Represented By: Sean Howard McKee
Represented By: Andrew Collier Mihelich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trisha North
Represented By: Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr
Represented By: Laura L Hamilton
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?