McLaughlin et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Sarah McLaughlin and Christopher McLaughlin
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and FRN of Tulsa, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00096
Filed: March 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
2 Judge: John F Heil
3 Judge: Susan E Huntsman
4 Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #53 MOTION in Limine Ford Motor Company's Omnibus Motion in Limine and Brief in Support ) by Ford Motor Company ; (With attachments) (Richardson, Andrew)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #61 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Dismissed/Abandoned Claims ) by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin ; (Mwafulirwa, Mbilike)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #62 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Ownership of Ford Vehicles ) by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin ; (Mwafulirwa, Mbilike)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #57 MOTION in Limine to Exclude or Limit Chris Eikey's Expert Testimony ) by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin ; (Mwafulirwa, Mbilike)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #58 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Dissimilar Incidents & Statistics ) by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin ; (Mwafulirwa, Mbilike)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #60 MOTION in Limine Regarding Compliance with FMVSS ) by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin ; (Mwafulirwa, Mbilike)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #59 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Ford's Drop Test, #56 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Malibu & Cris Testing ) by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin ; (With attachments) (Mwafulirwa, Mbilike)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #54 MOTION in Limine Ford Motor Company's Motion in Limine to Exclude References to Punitive Damages and Ford's Financial Condition and Brief in Support ) by Ford Motor Company ; (Richardson, Andrew)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #64 MOTION in Limine Ford Motor Company's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Other Incidents and Brief in Support ) by Ford Motor Company ; (With attachments) (Richardson, Andrew)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #64 MOTION in Limine Ford Motor Company's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Other Incidents and Brief in Support ) by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin ; (With attachments) (Mwafulirwa, Mbilike)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #54 MOTION in Limine Ford Motor Company's Motion in Limine to Exclude References to Punitive Damages and Ford's Financial Condition and Brief in Support ) by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin ; (Mwafulirwa, Mbilike)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #53 MOTION in Limine Ford Motor Company's Omnibus Motion in Limine and Brief in Support ) by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin ; (Mwafulirwa, Mbilike)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Ford Motor Company's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Ford's Drop Test (Re: #59 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Ford's Drop Test ) by Ford Motor Company ; (With attachments) (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Ford Motor Company's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine to Exclude Evidence of Dissimilar Incidents and Statistics (Re: #58 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Dissimilar Incidents & Statistics ) by Ford Motor Company ; (With attachments) (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Ford Motor Company's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine to Exclude or Limit Chris Eikey's Expert Testimony (Re: #57 MOTION in Limine to Exclude or Limit Chris Eikey's Expert Testimony ) by Ford Motor Company ; (With attachments) (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Ford Motor Company's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude All Evidence of Ownership of Ford Vehicles (Re: #62 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Ownership of Ford Vehicles ) by Ford Motor Company ; (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Ford Motor Company's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine Regarding Compliance with Federal Motor Vehicle Safety Standards (Re: #60 MOTION in Limine Regarding Compliance with FMVSS ) by Ford Motor Company ; (With attachments) (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Ford Motor Company's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Malibu and CRIS Testing (Re: #56 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Malibu & Cris Testing ) by Ford Motor Company ; (With attachments) (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Ford Motor Company's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Claims or Causes of Action Dismissed or Abandoned Before Trial (Re: #61 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Dismissed/Abandoned Claims ) by Ford Motor Company ; (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Ford Motor Company's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Argument or Evidence Regarding Design and/or Roof Strength Performance of Non-Ford Manufactured Trucks or Vehicles (Re: #63 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Non-Ford Vehicles ) by Ford Motor Company ; (With attachments) (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE ADVICE TO THE COURT by Ford Motor Company (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT of Jennifer Buckman, Christopher Eikey, Sierra Cody, Trooper Brack Miller, Trooper Chad Pape - Highlighted with Designations and Counterdesignations and Annotated with Objections (received and forwarded to the Presiding Judge) by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin (blc, Dpty Clk)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 OBJECTION to Deposition Designations re: depo of Chad Pape and Sierra Cody Ford Motor Company Objections to Plaintiffs' Deposition Counter-Designations (Re: #68 Counter Deposition Designations ) by Ford Motor Company (Richardson, Andrew)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Judge Gregory K Frizzell: Status Hearing held on 8/7/2023 striking pretrial on 10/2/2023 and jury trial on 10/16/2023, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 9/1/2023, Replies due by 9/15/2023, Status Hearing set for 1/11/2024 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (Re: #60 MOTION in Limine Regarding Compliance with FMVSS, #59 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Ford's Drop Test, #64 MOTION in Limine Ford Motor Company's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Other Incidents and Brief in Support, #56 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Malibu & Cris Testing, #63 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Non-Ford Vehicles, #58 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Dissimilar Incidents & Statistics, #62 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Ownership of Ford Vehicles, #61 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Dismissed/Abandoned Claims, #57 MOTION in Limine to Exclude or Limit Chris Eikey's Expert Testimony, #54 MOTION in Limine Ford Motor Company's Motion in Limine to Exclude References to Punitive Damages and Ford's Financial Condition and Brief in Support, #53 MOTION in Limine Ford Motor Company's Omnibus Motion in Limine and Brief in Support ) (Court Reporter: Brian Neil) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell a telephone status conference is scheduled for Monday, August 7th at 9:30 am. Defense counsel is directed to set up the call and notify the Court and all counsel of the conference call-in number and access information, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Status Hearing set for 8/7/2023 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Judge Gregory K Frizzell: Status Hearing held on 8/2/2023 , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 8/7/2023) (Court Reporter: none) (alg, Dpty Clk)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE Advice to the Court Concerning Motions in Limine by Ford Motor Company (Richardson, Andrew)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 COUNTER DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by Ford Motor Company (Richardson, Andrew)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 COUNTER DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin (Lair, Montgomery)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell no dispositive motions having been filed by the June 21st deadline, the dispositive motion hearing set on September 12, 2023 is stricken., striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell setting an IN-PERSON Status Conference for August 2, 2023 at 1:30PM, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Status Hearing set for 8/2/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell The parties have filed eleven motions in limine. The Scheduling Order entered in this matter required the attorneys for the parties to meet to resolve issues prior to filing any motions in limine. See [Doc. 41]. None of the motions certify that counsel met and conferred as required. Accordingly, on or before July 31, 2023, the parties are directed to meet and confer regarding the motions in limine and file a Notice with this court advising, which, if any, of the motion in limine topics may be granted by agreement and what matters remain in dispute for resolution by this court., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 7/31/2023) (Re: #63 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Non-Ford Vehicles, #54 MOTION in Limine Ford Motor Company's Motion in Limine to Exclude References to Punitive Damages and Ford's Financial Condition and Brief in Support, #60 MOTION in Limine Regarding Compliance with FMVSS, #57 MOTION in Limine to Exclude or Limit Chris Eikey's Expert Testimony, #59 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Ford's Drop Test, #58 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Dissimilar Incidents & Statistics, #56 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Malibu & Cris Testing, #62 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Ownership of Ford Vehicles, #53 MOTION in Limine Ford Motor Company's Omnibus Motion in Limine and Brief in Support, #64 MOTION in Limine Ford Motor Company's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Other Incidents and Brief in Support, #61 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Dismissed/Abandoned Claims ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION in Limine Ford Motor Company's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Other Incidents and Brief in Support by Ford Motor Company (With attachments) (Richardson, Andrew)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Non-Ford Vehicles by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin (Lair, Montgomery)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Ownership of Ford Vehicles by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin (Lair, Montgomery)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Dismissed/Abandoned Claims by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin (Lair, Montgomery)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION in Limine Regarding Compliance with FMVSS by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin (With attachments) (Lair, Montgomery)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Ford's Drop Test by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin (Lair, Montgomery)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Dissimilar Incidents & Statistics by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin (Lair, Montgomery)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION in Limine to Exclude or Limit Chris Eikey's Expert Testimony by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin (Lair, Montgomery)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Malibu & Cris Testing by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin (Lair, Montgomery)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 DESIGNATIONS (DEPOSITION/INTERROGATORY) re: deposition/interrogatories of Jennifer Buckman and Chris Eikey by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin (Lair, Montgomery)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION in Limine Ford Motor Company's Motion in Limine to Exclude References to Punitive Damages and Ford's Financial Condition and Brief in Support by Ford Motor Company (With attachments) (Richardson, Andrew)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION in Limine Ford Motor Company's Omnibus Motion in Limine and Brief in Support by Ford Motor Company (With attachments) (Richardson, Andrew)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 DESIGNATIONS (DEPOSITION/INTERROGATORY) re: deposition/interrogatories of Trooper Chad Pape, Trooper Brack Miller & Sierra Cody by Ford Motor Company (Richardson, Andrew)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE Advice to Court Concering Mediation Held June 13 2023 (Re: 50 Minute Order,,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),,, Ruling on Motion for Settlement Conference,, ) by Ford Motor Company (Richardson, Andrew)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little The Joint Application to strike the settlement conference is granted, as the parties have advised that they have already arranged for a private mediation on June 13, 2023. By June 20, 2023, the parties shall file a notice to inform the court whether or not the case settled at private mediation. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 6/20/2023); granting #48 Motion for Settlement Conference (Re: #48 Joint MOTION for Settlement Conference Joint Application to be Excused from Settlement Conference Setting ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (CDL2, Chambers)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little , referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge Little (Re: #48 Joint MOTION for Settlement Conference Joint Application to be Excused from Settlement Conference Setting ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Joint MOTION for Settlement Conference Joint Application to be Excused from Settlement Conference Setting by Ford Motor Company (Richardson, Andrew)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Paul F. Malek on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Malek, Paul) Modified on 5/2/2023 to correct filer (lmt, Dpty Clk).
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting motion for admission pro hac vice [Doc. 45] of defendant, Ford Motor Company. Paul F. Malek is admitted pro hac vice and is directed to file separate entry of appearance forthwith ; granting #45 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Re: #45 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paul F. Malek to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2799980) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paul F. Malek to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2799980) by Ford Motor Company (With attachments) (Richardson, Andrew)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): before ASJ James E. Weger (his office) ( Settlement Conference set for 6/14/2023 at 01:30 PM before Adjunct Settlement Judge) (CDL2, Chambers) (Main Document 44 replaced on 1/26/2023) to include signature block (lmt, Dpty Clk).
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: main document did not include signature; Correction: replaced with corrected PDF (Re: #44 Settlement Conference Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s), ) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman ; granting #42 Motion for Protective Order (kah, Chambers)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Ford Motor Company (With attachments) (Prosser, Dru)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 5/22/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 6/21/2023, Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/25/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2023 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Jury Trial set for 10/16/2023 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Upon review of the parties' Joint Notice [Doc. 39], the Court concludes that defendant's expert identification and report shall be due on March 21, 2023. The Court shall enter a scheduling order as requested by the parties. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE JOINT NOTICE TO THE COURT ON PLEADINGS & REQUEST FOR A SCHEDULING ORDER OR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin (Mwafulirwa, Mbilike)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (lah, Chambers)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell The court having granted plaintiffs until June 3, 2022 to file a motion for leave to amend the Complaint, the court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case until the pleadings are closed. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; denying #19 Motion to Remand; denying #21 Motion to Strike Document(s) (lah, Chambers)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Due to Court conflict, recusing Judge Terence Kern. Judge Gregory K Frizzell reassigned to case., changing case number to 21-cv-96-GKF-SH (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (clb, Dpty Clk)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Due to Court conflict, recusing Chief Judge John F Heil, III. Judge Terence Kern reassigned to case., changing case number to 21-CV-096-TCK-SH (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: This is a discovery document which should not be filed; Correction: Notified counsel that discovery should not be filed (Re: #33 Notice (Other) ) (sc, Dpty Clk)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE Notice of Subpoenas for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Prosser, Dru) Modified on 10/5/2021 - This is a discovery document which should not be filed. (sc, Dpty Clk).
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #21 MOTION to Strike Document(s) ) by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin ; (Mwafulirwa, Mbilike)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #19 MOTION to Remand ) by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin ; (Mwafulirwa, Mbilike)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk reassigning the magistrate judge in this case pursuant to General Order 21-15, reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman, Magistrate Judge Christine D Little no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 21-cv-96-JFH-SH (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Joint RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Defendants Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant's Notice of Consent to Removal (Re: #21 MOTION to Strike Document(s) ) by FRN of Tulsa, LLC, Ford Motor Company ; (Richardson, Andrew)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Joint RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #19 MOTION to Remand ) by FRN of Tulsa, LLC, Ford Motor Company ; (Richardson, Andrew)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by FRN of Tulsa, LLC ; (Richardson, Andrew)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER by Judge John F Heil, III : Granting FRN of Tulsa's motion to withdraw attorneys ; terminating attorney Bobby Leon Latham, Jr and Troy James McPherson ; granting #25 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) by FRN of Tulsa, LLC (McPherson, Troy)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Dru Aldric Prosser on behalf of FRN of Tulsa, LLC [Note: Attorney Dru Aldric Prosser added to party FRN of Tulsa, LLC(pty:dft).] (Prosser, Dru)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mary Quinn-Cooper on behalf of FRN of Tulsa, LLC [Note: Attorney Mary Quinn-Cooper added to party FRN of Tulsa, LLC(pty:dft).] (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew Lee Richardson on behalf of FRN of Tulsa, LLC [Note: Attorney Andrew Lee Richardson added to party FRN of Tulsa, LLC(pty:dft).] (Richardson, Andrew)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Strike Document(s) (Re: #20 Notice (Other) ) by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin (Mwafulirwa, Mbilike)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE Notice of Consent to Removal (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by FRN of Tulsa, LLC (McPherson, Troy)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Remand by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin (With attachments) (Mwafulirwa, Mbilike)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Christopher McLaughlin, Sarah McLaughlin ; (Mwafulirwa, Mbilike)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge John F Heil, III re: amended complaint (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) (pll, Dpty Clk)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing FRN of Tulsa, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Penske Automotive Group, Inc. for FRN of Tulsa, LLC) by FRN of Tulsa, LLC (McPherson, Troy)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by FRN of Tulsa, LLC (McPherson, Troy)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Troy James McPherson on behalf of FRN of Tulsa, LLC (McPherson, Troy)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bobby Leon Latham, Jr on behalf of FRN of Tulsa, LLC (Latham, Bobby)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Ford Motor Company (Richardson, Andrew)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ford Motor Company (Prosser, Dru)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk randomly reassigning case due to conflict, recusing Chief Judge John E Dowdell. Judge John F Heil, III reassigned to case., changing case number to 21-cv-00096-JFH-CDL (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Ford Motor Company (Richardson, Andrew)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Dru Aldric Prosser on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Prosser, Dru)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mary Quinn-Cooper on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew Lee Richardson on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Richardson, Andrew)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing FRN of Tulsa, LLC, Ford Motor Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County, case number CJ-2021-265 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2366881) by Ford Motor Company (With attachments) (Richardson, Andrew)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ford Motor Company (Richardson, Andrew)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against FRN of Tulsa, LLC, Ford Motor Company by Sarah McLaughlin, Christopher McLaughlin (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLaughlin et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah McLaughlin
Represented By: Mbilike Mwafulirwa
Represented By: Clark Otto Brewster
Represented By: Montgomery Lloyd Lair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher McLaughlin
Represented By: Mbilike Mwafulirwa
Represented By: Clark Otto Brewster
Represented By: Montgomery Lloyd Lair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Mary Quinn-Cooper
Represented By: Andrew Lee Richardson
Represented By: Dru Aldric Prosser
Represented By: Paul F Malek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRN of Tulsa, LLC
Represented By: Mary Quinn-Cooper
Represented By: Andrew Lee Richardson
Represented By: Dru Aldric Prosser
Represented By: Troy James McPherson
Represented By: Bobby Leon Latham, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?