Floyd et al v. BP p.l.c. et al
Plaintiff: Lorena Ann Goforth, Jennifer Gail Robinson, Virginia Floyd, Joanna Paul and Johnny Dale Floyd
Defendant: Robert Lee Bolin, EPEC Oil Company Liquidating Trust, BP America Inc., Kinder Morgan, Inc., BP p.l.c., Marathon Petroleum Corporation, BP Pipelines (North America) Inc., Daniel Phillips Bolin, El Paso Energy E.S.T. Co., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Oil Company, Atlantic Richfield Company, EPEC Oil Company, Charles William Bolin, Daniel Houston Bolin, Midwestern Gas Transmission Co., Marathon Oil Corporation, El Paso Tennessee Pipeline Co., L.L.C., Bolin Oil Company, Philip Elias and BP Corporation North America Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00132
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Claire V Eagan
2 Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Brief in Support of Motion); Correction: corrected text for event (Reply to Response to Motion) (Re: #46 Brief in Support of Motion, ) (sc, Dpty Clk)
May 20, 2021 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #43 MOTION to Remand ) by Johnny Dale Floyd, Virginia Floyd, Lorena Ann Goforth, Joanna Paul, Jennifer Gail Robinson ; (With attachments) (Blaschke, Michael) Modified on 5/20/2021 to edit docket text to reflect correct event (sc, Dpty Clk).
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , : Counsel for Kinder Morgan, Inc. is directed to provide, forthwith and in a three-ring binder notebook for use by the Court, a paper copy of the document and/or exhibit(s) as filed at Dkt. #44 . Said paper copy shall be a COMPLETE and EXACT duplicate of the filing AFTER it is filed with the Court, including the case and docket number information at the top of each page. Counsel shall not reorganize the filing or insert other separately docketed items. If a copy of a sealed item is ordered by the Court, then said copy shall be a separate and complete submission. (Re: #44 Response in Opposition to Motion ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
May 10, 2021 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #43 MOTION to Remand ) by Kinder Morgan, Inc. ; (With attachments) (Banner, Mark)
April 19, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION to Remand by Johnny Dale Floyd, Virginia Floyd, Lorena Ann Goforth, Joanna Paul, Jennifer Gail Robinson (With attachments) (Blaschke, Michael)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - that the motion #41 is granted. Plaintiffs' responses to defendants' motions to dismiss [9, 18, 19] shall be due 10 days after ruling on the yet-to-be-filed motion to remand. ; granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #41 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
April 13, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Johnny Dale Floyd, Virginia Floyd, Lorena Ann Goforth, Joanna Paul, Jennifer Gail Robinson (Blaschke, Michael)
April 8, 2021 Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Marathon Oil Corporation for Marathon Oil Company) by Marathon Oil Company (Blakley, Kenneth)
April 8, 2021 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marathon Oil Corporation (Blakley, Kenneth)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the motion #34 is granted. Philip Elias' Answer or other responsive pleading due 10 days after ruling on anticipated motion to remand or ruling on other defendants' motions to dismiss [9, 18, 19]. ; granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
April 7, 2021 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Blakley, Kenneth)
April 7, 2021 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marathon Petroleum Company LP (Blakley, Kenneth)
April 7, 2021 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent ONEOK, Inc., Corporate Parent ONEOK Partners, L.P., Corporate Parent ONEOK Partners Intermediate Limited Partnership, Corporate Parent Border Midwestern Company for Midwestern Gas Transmission Co.) by Midwestern Gas Transmission Co. (Sullivan, Timothy)
April 6, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Philip Elias (Jones, Mike)
April 6, 2021 Filing 33 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mike Walter Jones on behalf of Philip Elias (Jones, Mike)
April 6, 2021 Filing 32 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael J Blaschke on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Blaschke, Michael)
April 1, 2021 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Kinder Morgan, Inc. for El Paso Energy E.S.T. Co.) by El Paso Energy E.S.T. Co. (Banner, Mark)
April 1, 2021 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Kinder Morgan, Inc. for El Paso Tennessee Pipeline Co., L.L.C.) by El Paso Tennessee Pipeline Co., L.L.C. (Banner, Mark)
April 1, 2021 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Kinder Morgan, Inc. for EPEC Oil Company Liquidating Trust) by EPEC Oil Company Liquidating Trust (Banner, Mark)
April 1, 2021 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EPEC Oil Company (Banner, Mark)
April 1, 2021 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (Banner, Mark)
April 1, 2021 Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing BP p.l.c, Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP America Inc., BP Pipelines (North America) Inc., Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, and Midwestern Gas Transmission Co. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in entering the order for joint status report. If necessary, an order for joint status report will be entered after ruling on the anticipated motions to remand or ruling on on the pending motions to dismiss (Dkt. # 9, 18, 19). (Re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - that the motion #21 is granted. Defendant Midwestern Gas Transmission Co.s Answer or other responsive pleading due 10 days after ruling on anticipated motion to remand or ruling on other defendants' motions to dismiss [9, 18, 19]. ; granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
March 31, 2021 Filing 23 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stacy L Acord on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Pipelines (North America) Inc., BP p.l.c. (Acord, Stacy)
March 31, 2021 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven Joseph Adams on behalf of Midwestern Gas Transmission Co. (Adams, Steven)
March 31, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Petition (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Midwestern Gas Transmission Co. (Sullivan, Timothy)
March 31, 2021 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Timothy J Sullivan, II on behalf of Midwestern Gas Transmission Co. (Sullivan, Timothy)
March 31, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by EPEC Oil Company, EPEC Oil Company Liquidating Trust, El Paso Energy E.S.T. Co., El Paso Tennessee Pipeline Co., L.L.C., Kinder Morgan, Inc. (Banner, Mark)
March 31, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Blakley, Kenneth)
March 31, 2021 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Travis Walter Brown on behalf of Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Brown, Travis)
March 31, 2021 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jacqueline Gayle Stone on behalf of Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Stone, Jacqueline)
March 31, 2021 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kenneth H Blakley on behalf of Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Blakley, Kenneth)
March 31, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent BP p.l.c., Corporate Parent BP Holdings North America Limited, Corporate Parent BP America Limited for BP America Inc.) by BP America Inc. (McDaniel, Archer)
March 31, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BP p.l.c. (McDaniel, Archer)
March 31, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent BP Company North America Inc., Corporate Parent BP America Inc., Corporate Parent BP p.l.c., Corporate Parent BP Holdings North America Limited, Corporate Parent BP Corporation North America Inc., Corporate Parent BP America Limited, Corporate Parent The Standard Oil Company for BP Pipelines (North America) Inc.) by BP Pipelines (North America) Inc. (McDaniel, Archer)
March 31, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent BP America Inc., Corporate Parent BP p.l.c., Corporate Parent BP Holdings North America Limited, Corporate Parent BP America Limited for BP Corporation North America Inc.) by BP Corporation North America Inc. (McDaniel, Archer)
March 31, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent BP America, Inc., Corporate Parent BP p.l.c., Corporate Parent BP Holdings North America Limited, Corporate Parent BP America Limited for Atlantic Richfield Company) by Atlantic Richfield Company (McDaniel, Archer)
March 31, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Pipelines (North America) Inc., BP p.l.c. (With attachments) (McDaniel, Archer)
March 31, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Archer Scott McDaniel, Stacy L Acord and Melissa A East on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Pipelines (North America) Inc., BP p.l.c. (McDaniel, Archer) Modified on 3/31/2021 to add text identifying all attorneys appearing (sac, Dpty Clk).
March 30, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk randomly reassigning case due to conflict, recusing Chief Judge John E Dowdell. Judge Claire V Eagan reassigned to case., changing case number to 21-cv-00132-CVE-CDL (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
March 25, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Kinder Morgan, Inc., EPEC Oil Company Liquidating Trust, El Paso Tennessee Pipeline Co., L.L.C., El Paso Energy E.S.T. Co., EPEC Oil Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk)
March 24, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Dawson Andrew Brotemarkle on behalf of EPEC Oil Company, EPEC Oil Company Liquidating Trust, El Paso Energy E.S.T. Co., El Paso Tennessee Pipeline Co., L.L.C., Kinder Morgan, Inc. (Brotemarkle, Dawson)
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Banner on behalf of EPEC Oil Company, EPEC Oil Company Liquidating Trust, El Paso Energy E.S.T. Co., El Paso Tennessee Pipeline Co., L.L.C., Kinder Morgan, Inc. (Banner, Mark)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (Banner, Mark)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Creek County, Bristow Division, case number BCJ-2020-00025 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2379027) by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (With attachments) (Banner, Mark)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (Banner, Mark)
November 6, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Jennifer Gail Robinson, Johnny Dale Floyd, Joanna Paul, Virginia Floyd, Lorena Ann Goforth (ll, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Floyd et al v. BP p.l.c. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lee Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPEC Oil Company Liquidating Trust
Represented By: Dawson Andrew Brotemarkle
Represented By: Mark Banner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Inc.
Represented By: Stacy L Acord
Represented By: Melissa Ann East
Represented By: Archer Scott McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan, Inc.
Represented By: Dawson Andrew Brotemarkle
Represented By: Mark Banner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP p.l.c.
Represented By: Stacy L Acord
Represented By: Melissa Ann East
Represented By: Archer Scott McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth H Blakley
Represented By: Robert Dale Edinger
Represented By: Jacqueline Gayle Stone
Represented By: Travis Walter Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Pipelines (North America) Inc.
Represented By: Stacy L Acord
Represented By: Melissa Ann East
Represented By: Archer Scott McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Phillips Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Energy E.S.T. Co.
Represented By: Dawson Andrew Brotemarkle
Represented By: Mark Banner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Company LP
Represented By: Kenneth H Blakley
Represented By: Robert Dale Edinger
Represented By: Jacqueline Gayle Stone
Represented By: Travis Walter Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Oil Company
Represented By: Kenneth H Blakley
Represented By: Robert Dale Edinger
Represented By: Jacqueline Gayle Stone
Represented By: Travis Walter Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Richfield Company
Represented By: Stacy L Acord
Represented By: Melissa Ann East
Represented By: Archer Scott McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPEC Oil Company
Represented By: Dawson Andrew Brotemarkle
Represented By: Mark Banner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles William Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Houston Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwestern Gas Transmission Co.
Represented By: Dawson Andrew Brotemarkle
Represented By: Mark Banner
Represented By: Timothy J Sullivan, II
Represented By: Steven Joseph Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Oil Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth H Blakley
Represented By: Robert Dale Edinger
Represented By: Jacqueline Gayle Stone
Represented By: Travis Walter Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Tennessee Pipeline Co., L.L.C.
Represented By: Dawson Andrew Brotemarkle
Represented By: Mark Banner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bolin Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Elias
Represented By: Mike Walter Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Corporation North America Inc.
Represented By: Stacy L Acord
Represented By: Melissa Ann East
Represented By: Archer Scott McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorena Ann Goforth
Represented By: Michael J Blaschke
Represented By: Allan DeVore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Gail Robinson
Represented By: Michael J Blaschke
Represented By: Allan DeVore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Floyd
Represented By: Michael J Blaschke
Represented By: Allan DeVore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Paul
Represented By: Michael J Blaschke
Represented By: Allan DeVore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Dale Floyd
Represented By: Michael J Blaschke
Represented By: Allan DeVore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?