Bark et al v. Independent School District No. 16 of Mayes County, Oklahoma et al
Plaintiff: Kim Burgess, Katherine Polk, Mandi Bennett, Jessica Packard, Tammy Bark, Jolene Lindsay, Kathi Smith, Leah Hurry, Misty Calhoon, Kristen Shatswell, Billie Pait and Kellie Guess
Defendant: John Q Horner and Independent School District No. 16 of Mayes County, Oklahoma
Case Number: 4:2021cv00213
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (Initial), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 12/31/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 2/4/2022, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/21/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 3/29/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Jury Trial set for 4/18/2022 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) (crp, Dpty Clk)
June 24, 2021 Filing 13 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Independent School District No. 16 of Mayes County, Oklahoma (Breipohl, Adam)
June 16, 2021 Filing 12 JURY DEMAND by Tammy Bark, Mandi Bennett, Kim Burgess, Misty Calhoon, Kellie Guess, Leah Hurry, Jolene Lindsay, Jessica Packard, Billie Pait, Katherine Polk, Kristen Shatswell, Kathi Smith (Spradling, Cameron)
June 16, 2021 Filing 11 JURY DEMAND by Tammy Bark (Spradling, Cameron)
May 26, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tod Soper Mercer on behalf of Tammy Bark [Note: Attorney Tod Soper Mercer added to party Tammy Bark(pty:pla).] (Mercer, Tod)
May 24, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, ) by John Q Horner (Sonne, Blake)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 6/24/2021) (RGG, Chambers)
May 24, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, ) by Independent School District No. 16 of Mayes County, Oklahoma (Priddy, John)
May 24, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Blake Sonne on behalf of John Q Horner [Note: Attorney Blake Sonne added to party John Q Horner(pty:dft).] (Sonne, Blake)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Cameron M Spradling on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Cameron M Spradling added to party Tammy Bark(pty:pla), Attorney Cameron M Spradling added to party Mandi Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Cameron M Spradling added to party Kim Burgess(pty:pla), Attorney Cameron M Spradling added to party Misty Calhoon(pty:pla), Attorney Cameron M Spradling added to party Kellie Guess(pty:pla), Attorney Cameron M Spradling added to party Leah Hurry(pty:pla), Attorney Cameron M Spradling added to party Jolene Lindsay(pty:pla), Attorney Cameron M Spradling added to party Jessica Packard(pty:pla), Attorney Cameron M Spradling added to party Billie Pait(pty:pla), Attorney Cameron M Spradling added to party Katherine Polk(pty:pla), Attorney Cameron M Spradling added to party Kristen Shatswell(pty:pla), Attorney Cameron M Spradling added to party Kathi Smith(pty:pla).] (Spradling, Cameron)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Adam Scott Breipohl on behalf of Independent School District No. 16 of Mayes County, Oklahoma [Note: Attorney Adam Scott Breipohl added to party Independent School District No. 16 of Mayes County, Oklahoma(pty:dft).] (Breipohl, Adam)
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Eric Priddy on behalf of Independent School District No. 16 of Mayes County, Oklahoma (Priddy, John)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Mayes County, case number CJ-2020-183 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2411940) by Independent School District No. 16 of Mayes County, Oklahoma (With attachments) (Priddy, John)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Independent School District No. 16 of Mayes County, Oklahoma (Priddy, John)
April 29, 2021 Amended PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Kellie Guess, Misty Calhoon, Kim Burgess, Kathi Smith, Tammy Bark, Mandi Bennett, Jolene Lindsay, Kristen Shatswell, Katherine Polk, Leah Hurry, Billie Pait, Jessica Packard (ll, Dpty Clk)
November 2, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Kellie Guess, Misty Calhoon, Kim Burgess, Kathi Smith, Tammy Bark, Mandi Bennett, Jolene Lindsay, Kristen Shatswell, Katherine Polk, Leah Hurry, Billie Pait, Jessica Packard (ll, Dpty Clk) Modified on 5/17/2021 to correct file date (ll, Dpty Clk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bark et al v. Independent School District No. 16 of Mayes County, Oklahoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Burgess
Represented By: Taylor Chase McBride
Represented By: Cameron M Spradling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Polk
Represented By: Taylor Chase McBride
Represented By: Cameron M Spradling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandi Bennett
Represented By: Taylor Chase McBride
Represented By: Cameron M Spradling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Packard
Represented By: Taylor Chase McBride
Represented By: Cameron M Spradling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Bark
Represented By: Taylor Chase McBride
Represented By: Cameron M Spradling
Represented By: Tod Soper Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolene Lindsay
Represented By: Taylor Chase McBride
Represented By: Cameron M Spradling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathi Smith
Represented By: Taylor Chase McBride
Represented By: Cameron M Spradling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Hurry
Represented By: Taylor Chase McBride
Represented By: Cameron M Spradling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Calhoon
Represented By: Taylor Chase McBride
Represented By: Cameron M Spradling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Shatswell
Represented By: Taylor Chase McBride
Represented By: Cameron M Spradling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie Pait
Represented By: Taylor Chase McBride
Represented By: Cameron M Spradling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie Guess
Represented By: Taylor Chase McBride
Represented By: Cameron M Spradling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Q Horner
Represented By: Blake Sonne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent School District No. 16 of Mayes County, Oklahoma
Represented By: John Eric Priddy
Represented By: Adam Scott Breipohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?