Doe v. Oologah-Talala Independent School District No. 4 of Rogers County, Oklahoma et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Brady DeSpain, Max Tanner, Dewilton Rhoden, Trent Winters, Oologah-Talala Independent School District No. 4 of Rogers County, Oklahoma, Kevin Hogue, Tony Sappington and Dawn Martinez
Case Number: 4:2021cv00240
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Trent Winters (Coulter, Jean)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III : granting Winters until 7/30/21 to respond to the amended complaint ; granting #29 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #23 Amended Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
July 21, 2021 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #23 Amended Complaint ) by Trent Winters (Coulter, Jean)
July 20, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Dewilton Rhoden (Mihelich, Andrew)
July 20, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER (Re: #23 Amended Complaint ) by Brady DeSpain, Kevin Hogue, Dawn Martinez, Oologah-Talala Independent School District No. 4 of Rogers County, Oklahoma, Tony Sappington, Max Tanner (Cyran, Matthew)
July 20, 2021 Filing 26 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Combined Brief in Support by Brady DeSpain, Kevin Hogue, Dawn Martinez, Tony Sappington, Max Tanner (Cyran, Matthew)
July 20, 2021 Filing 25 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Combined Brief in Support by Oologah-Talala Independent School District No. 4 of Rogers County, Oklahoma (Cyran, Matthew)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III : Following the filing of the second amended complaint ; finding as moot #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; finding as moot #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; finding as moot #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
July 6, 2021 Filing 23 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Jane Doe (With attachments) (Shaffer, Caroline)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III : Granting Rhoden until 7/12/21 to respond to the complaint ; granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
June 25, 2021 Filing 21 ADOPTION (Re: #2 Notice of Removal, ) by Trent Winters (Coulter, Jean)
June 24, 2021 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew Collier Mihelich on behalf of Dewilton Rhoden [Note: Attorney Andrew Collier Mihelich added to party Dewilton Rhoden(pty:dft).] (Mihelich, Andrew)
June 24, 2021 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Dewilton Rhoden (LeBlanc, Thomas)
June 24, 2021 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Thomas Adrian LeBlanc on behalf of Dewilton Rhoden [Note: Attorney Thomas Adrian LeBlanc added to party Dewilton Rhoden(pty:dft).] (LeBlanc, Thomas)
June 18, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Trent Winters (Coulter, Jean)
June 16, 2021 Filing 16 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Combined Brief in Support by Brady DeSpain, Kevin Hogue, Dawn Martinez, Tony Sappington, Max Tanner (Cyran, Matthew)
June 16, 2021 Filing 15 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Combined Brief in Support by Oologah-Talala Independent School District No. 4 of Rogers County, Oklahoma (Cyran, Matthew)
June 16, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Brady DeSpain, Kevin Hogue, Dawn Martinez, Oologah-Talala Independent School District No. 4 of Rogers County, Oklahoma, Tony Sappington, Max Tanner (Cyran, Matthew)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Judge John F Heil, III : Granting defendant Winters until 6/18/21 to respond to the amended petition ; granting #11 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
June 11, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #11 Opposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) ) by Jane Doe ; (With attachments) (Shaffer, Caroline)
June 11, 2021 Filing 11 Opposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) by Trent Winters [Note: Attorney Jean Walpole Coulter added to party Trent Winters(pty:dft).] (Coulter, Jean)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Judge John F Heil, III : Granting certain defendants until 6/16/21 to answer the amended petition ; granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
June 9, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead ) by Jane Doe ; (With attachments) (Shaffer, Caroline)
June 8, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Caroline Marie Shaffer on behalf of Jane Doe [Note: Attorney Caroline Marie Shaffer added to party Jane Doe(pty:pla).] (Shaffer, Caroline)
June 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Brady DeSpain, Kevin Hogue, Dawn Martinez, Oologah-Talala Independent School District No. 4 of Rogers County, Oklahoma, Tony Sappington, Max Tanner (Cyran, Matthew)
June 8, 2021 Filing 6 JURY DEMAND by Jane Doe (Wolin, Courtney)
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Courtney Michelle Wolin on behalf of Jane Doe [Note: Attorney Courtney Michelle Wolin added to party Jane Doe(pty:pla).] (Wolin, Courtney)
June 3, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Emily Catherine Krukowski on behalf of Brady DeSpain, Kevin Hogue, Dawn Martinez, Oologah-Talala Independent School District No. 4 of Rogers County, Oklahoma, Tony Sappington, Max Tanner [Note: Attorney Emily Catherine Krukowski added to party Brady DeSpain(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Catherine Krukowski added to party Kevin Hogue(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Catherine Krukowski added to party Dawn Martinez(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Catherine Krukowski added to party Oologah-Talala Independent School District No. 4 of Rogers County, Oklahoma(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Catherine Krukowski added to party Tony Sappington(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Catherine Krukowski added to party Max Tanner(pty:dft).] (Krukowski, Emily)
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Matthew Peter Cyran on behalf of Brady DeSpain, Kevin Hogue, Dawn Martinez, Oologah-Talala Independent School District No. 4 of Rogers County, Oklahoma, Tony Sappington, Max Tanner (Cyran, Matthew)
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from District Court of Rogers County, Oklahoma, case number CJ-2020-0347 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2421284) by Brady DeSpain, Kevin Hogue, Dawn Martinez, Oologah-Talala Independent School District No. 4 of Rogers County, Oklahoma, Tony Sappington, Max Tanner (With attachments) (Cyran, Matthew)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Brady DeSpain, Kevin Hogue, Dawn Martinez, Oologah-Talala Independent School District No. 4 of Rogers County, Oklahoma, Tony Sappington, Max Tanner [Note: Attorney Matthew Peter Cyran added to party Brady DeSpain(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Peter Cyran added to party Kevin Hogue(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Peter Cyran added to party Dawn Martinez(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Peter Cyran added to party Tony Sappington(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Peter Cyran added to party Max Tanner(pty:dft).] (Cyran, Matthew)
March 16, 2021 Amended PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by Jane Doe (ll, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Oologah-Talala Independent School District No. 4 of Rogers County, Oklahoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brady DeSpain
Represented By: Matthew Peter Cyran
Represented By: Emily Catherine Krukowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Tanner
Represented By: Matthew Peter Cyran
Represented By: Emily Catherine Krukowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewilton Rhoden
Represented By: Andrew Collier Mihelich
Represented By: Thomas Adrian LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Winters
Represented By: Jean Walpole Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oologah-Talala Independent School District No. 4 of Rogers County, Oklahoma
Represented By: Matthew Peter Cyran
Represented By: Emily Catherine Krukowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Hogue
Represented By: Matthew Peter Cyran
Represented By: Emily Catherine Krukowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Sappington
Represented By: Matthew Peter Cyran
Represented By: Emily Catherine Krukowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Martinez
Represented By: Matthew Peter Cyran
Represented By: Emily Catherine Krukowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: George Eldon Gibbs
Represented By: Caroline Marie Shaffer
Represented By: Courtney Michelle Wolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?