Phelps v. Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dunniven Orlando Phelps
Defendant: Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC, Richard Dutra, Patty Buchanan, Amanda Gann and Vic Regalado
Case Number: 4:2021cv00365
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
2 Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Richard Dutra (Jeter, Jo)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting Defendant Vic Regalado's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead [Doc. 16]; Deadline to file Answer extended to November 10, 2021 ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 11/10/2021); granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (GKF1, Chambers)
October 28, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Vic Regalado (Wilkes, Keith)
October 28, 2021 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Keith A Wilkes on behalf of Vic Regalado [Note: Attorney Keith A Wilkes added to party Vic Regalado(pty:dft).] (Wilkes, Keith)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Deadline set 11/15/2021) ; granting #13 Motion to File Document Out of Time (kjp, Dpty Clk)
October 26, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to File Amanda Gann, RN's Response to Plaintiff's Complaint Out of Time by Amanda Gann (Jones, William)
October 20, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Vic Regalado (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Dunniven Orlando Phelps (Smolen, Daniel)
October 14, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (bjb, Dpty Clk)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Defendant Dutra's answer or other initial pleading is due on or before November 3, 2021. ; granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent TK Health Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent TCSCFI TK, LLC for Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC) by Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC (Jeter, Jo)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, recusing Judge Claire V Eagan. Judge Gregory K Frizzell reassigned to case., changing case number to 21-cv-365-GKF-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (clb, Dpty Clk)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William Caleb Jones on behalf of Patty Buchanan, Richard Dutra, Amanda Gann, Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC [Note: Attorney William Caleb Jones added to party Patty Buchanan(pty:dft), Attorney William Caleb Jones added to party Richard Dutra(pty:dft), Attorney William Caleb Jones added to party Amanda Gann(pty:dft), Attorney William Caleb Jones added to party Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC(pty:dft).] (Jones, William)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joel L Wohlgemuth on behalf of Patty Buchanan, Richard Dutra, Amanda Gann, Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC [Note: Attorney Joel L Wohlgemuth added to party Patty Buchanan(pty:dft), Attorney Joel L Wohlgemuth added to party Richard Dutra(pty:dft), Attorney Joel L Wohlgemuth added to party Amanda Gann(pty:dft), Attorney Joel L Wohlgemuth added to party Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC(pty:dft).] (Wohlgemuth, Joel)
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Richard Dutra (Jeter, Jo)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jo Lynn Jeter on behalf of Patty Buchanan, Richard Dutra, Amanda Gann, Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC [Note: Attorney Jo Lynn Jeter added to party Patty Buchanan(pty:dft), Attorney Jo Lynn Jeter added to party Richard Dutra(pty:dft), Attorney Jo Lynn Jeter added to party Amanda Gann(pty:dft), Attorney Jo Lynn Jeter added to party Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC(pty:dft).] (Jeter, Jo)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (ll, Dpty Clk)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2472408) by Dunniven Orlando Phelps (Blakemore, Robert)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Dunniven Orlando Phelps [Note: Attorney Robert Murray Blakemore added to party Dunniven Orlando Phelps(pty:pla).] (Blakemore, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phelps v. Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dunniven Orlando Phelps
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Represented By: Robert Murray Blakemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC
Represented By: Jo Lynn Jeter
Represented By: Joel L Wohlgemuth
Represented By: William Caleb Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Dutra
Represented By: Jo Lynn Jeter
Represented By: Joel L Wohlgemuth
Represented By: William Caleb Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Buchanan
Represented By: Jo Lynn Jeter
Represented By: Joel L Wohlgemuth
Represented By: William Caleb Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Gann
Represented By: Jo Lynn Jeter
Represented By: Joel L Wohlgemuth
Represented By: William Caleb Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vic Regalado
Represented By: Keith A Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?