Sutton v. Kiefer Public Schools et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Sutton
Defendant: Kiefer Public Schools, Kiefer Public Schools Board of Education and Mary Murell
Case Number: 4:2021cv00369
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Jessica Sutton (Briggs, Leslie)
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Daniel E Smolen on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Daniel E Smolen added to party Jessica Sutton(pty:pla).] (Smolen, Daniel)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE Statement of Death by Kiefer Public Schools, Kiefer Public Schools Board of Education, Mary Murell (Mathis, Rachel)
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stephan Scott Mathis on behalf of All Defendants (Mathis, Stephan)
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rachel Carver Mathis on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Rachel Carver Mathis added to party Kiefer Public Schools(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Carver Mathis added to party Kiefer Public Schools Board of Education(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Carver Mathis added to party Mary Murell(pty:dft).] (Mathis, Rachel)
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Roger Michael Gassett on behalf of All Defendants (Gassett, Roger)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 10/15/2021) (lmc, Chambers)
September 14, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Kiefer Public Schools, Kiefer Public Schools Board of Education, Mary Murell (Gassett, Roger)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Creek County (OK) District Court, case number CJ-2021-134 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2472739) by Kiefer Public Schools, Kiefer Public Schools Board of Education, Mary Murell (With attachments) (Gassett, Roger)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kiefer Public Schools, Kiefer Public Schools Board of Education, Mary Murell (Gassett, Roger)
July 9, 2021 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Jessica Sutton (blc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutton v. Kiefer Public Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Sutton
Represented By: Leslie Briggs
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiefer Public Schools
Represented By: Roger Michael Gassett
Represented By: Rachel Carver Mathis
Represented By: Stephan Scott Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiefer Public Schools Board of Education
Represented By: Roger Michael Gassett
Represented By: Rachel Carver Mathis
Represented By: Stephan Scott Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Murell
Represented By: Roger Michael Gassett
Represented By: Rachel Carver Mathis
Represented By: Stephan Scott Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?