Bridge Crane Specialists, LLC v. TNT Crane & Rigging, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bridge Crane Specialists, LLC
Defendant: TNT Crane & Rigging, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00405
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
2 Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion and Brief in Support (Re: #12 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District or, Alternatively, Dismiss or Transfer for Improper Venue and Brief in Support ) by Bridge Crane Specialists, LLC ; (With attachments) (Marciano, Lauren)
October 26, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing TNT Crane & Rigging, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (bjb, Dpty Clk)
October 22, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District or, Alternatively, Dismiss or Transfer for Improper Venue and Brief in Support by TNT Crane & Rigging, Inc. (With attachments) (Rudnicki, Leah)
October 22, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TNT Crane & Rigging, Inc. (Rudnicki, Leah)
October 22, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sharon Taylor Thomas on behalf of TNT Crane & Rigging, Inc. [Note: Attorney Sharon Taylor Thomas added to party TNT Crane & Rigging, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Thomas, Sharon)
October 22, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Leah Thomas Rudnicki on behalf of TNT Crane & Rigging, Inc. [Note: Attorney Leah Thomas Rudnicki added to party TNT Crane & Rigging, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Rudnicki, Leah)
October 5, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: TNT Crane & Rigging, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Bridge Crane Specialists, LLC (Marciano, Lauren)
September 29, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Michael Hickey on behalf of Bridge Crane Specialists, LLC [Note: Attorney John Michael Hickey added to party Bridge Crane Specialists, LLC(pty:pla).] (Hickey, John)
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to TNT Crane & Rigging, Inc. (ll, Dpty Clk) Modified on 9/29/2021 to correct file date (ll, Dpty Clk).
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bridge Crane Specialists, LLC (Marciano, Lauren)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Bridge Crane Specialists, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Due to Court conflict, recusing Chief Judge John F Heil, III. Judge Terence Kern reassigned to case., changing case number to 21-CV-405-TCK-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against TNT Crane & Rigging, Inc. by Bridge Crane Specialists, LLC (Marciano, Lauren)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Bridge Crane Specialists, LLC (Marciano, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridge Crane Specialists, LLC v. TNT Crane & Rigging, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridge Crane Specialists, LLC
Represented By: Lauren Michele Marciano
Represented By: John Michael Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TNT Crane & Rigging, Inc.
Represented By: Leah Thomas Rudnicki
Represented By: Sharon Taylor Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?