Stephens v. Public Service Company of Oklahoma et al
Plaintiff: Danielle Stephens
Defendant: American Electric Power/PSO Oklahoma, City of Tulsa Utilities, Oklahoma Natural Gas and Public Service Company of Oklahoma
Case Number: 4:2021cv00408
Filed: September 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of Tulsa Utilities [Note: Attorney Gerald M Bender added to party City of Tulsa Utilities(pty:dft).] (Bender, Gerald)
November 10, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Brief in Support ) by Danielle Stephens ; (lmt, Dpty Clk)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III ; finding as moot #8 Motion to Dismiss (Re: #5 Amended Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (JFH1, Chambers)
November 2, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Brief in Support (Re: #5 Amended Complaint) by Public Service Company of Oklahoma (Brightmire, Jon) Modified on 11/3/2021 to create link to dkt #5 (sc, Dpty Clk).
November 1, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service (ll, Dpty Clk)
October 18, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for American Electric Power/PSO Oklahoma be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #12 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
October 18, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by American Electric Power/PSO Oklahoma (Brightmire, Jon)
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing American Electric Power/PSO Oklahoma to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (bjb, Dpty Clk)
October 14, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Norman Lance Bryan on behalf of American Electric Power/PSO Oklahoma [Note: Attorney Norman Lance Bryan added to party American Electric Power/PSO Oklahoma(pty:dft).] (Bryan, Norman)
October 14, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent American Electric Power Company, Inc. for American Electric Power/PSO Oklahoma) by American Electric Power/PSO Oklahoma (Brightmire, Jon)
October 14, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by American Electric Power/PSO Oklahoma (Brightmire, Jon)
October 14, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jon E Brightmire on behalf of American Electric Power/PSO Oklahoma [Note: Attorney Jon E Brightmire added to party American Electric Power/PSO Oklahoma(pty:dft).] (Brightmire, Jon)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to American Electric Power/PSO Oklahoma, City of Tulsa Utilities, Oklahoma Natural Gas (ll, Dpty Clk)
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against American Electric Power/PSO Oklahoma, City of Tulsa Utilities, Oklahoma Natural Gas (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Danielle Stephens (ll, Dpty Clk)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4 FILING FEES Paid in Full by Danielle Stephens (bjb, Dpty Clk)
September 23, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (bjb, Dpty Clk) Modified on 9/24/2021 to correct file date (bjb, Dpty Clk).
September 23, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against American Electric Power/PSO Oklahoma, City of Tulsa Utilities, Oklahoma Natural Gas by Danielle Stephens (bjb, Dpty Clk)
September 23, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Danielle Stephens (bjb, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephens v. Public Service Company of Oklahoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Electric Power/PSO Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tulsa Utilities
Represented By: Gerald M Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Natural Gas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Service Company of Oklahoma
Represented By: Jon E Brightmire
Represented By: Norman Lance Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?